EP1506189 - PYRROLE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF ERK2 AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED 130 Waverly Street Cambridge, MA 02139-4242 / US | [2005/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALE, Michael, R. 42 Sunset Road Bedord, MA 01730 / US | 02 /
MALTAIS, Francois 24 Randolph Drive Tewksbury, MA 10876 / US | 03 /
TANG, Qing 2277 Massachusetts Avenue 5 Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | 04 /
STRAUB, Judith 70 Kinnaiard Street Cambridge, MA 02135 / US | 05 /
ARONOV, Alexander 13 Circuit Lane Watertown, MA 02472 / US | [2005/07] | Representative(s) | Gambell, Derek, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | Gambell, Derek, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/07] | Gambell, Derek Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03736503.8 | 25.04.2003 | [2005/07] | WO2003US13186 | Priority number, date | US20020376259P | 26.04.2002 Original published format: US 376259 P | US20020403853P | 14.08.2002 Original published format: US 403853 P | [2005/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03091246 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1506189 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/04, C07D401/14, C07D403/14, C07D405/14, C07D487/04, A61K31/506, A61P35/00, // (C07D487/04, 221:00, 209:00), C07D207:00 | [2005/07] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D207/333 (EP,US);
C07D207/337 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRROL-DERIVATE ALS INHIBITOREN VON ERK2 UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2005/07] | English: | PYRROLE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF ERK2 AND USES THEREOF | [2005/07] | French: | DERIVES DE PYRROLE UTILISES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE ERK2 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2005/07] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/07] | 04.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/17] | 06.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.12.2004 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | 09.12.2004 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.12.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   09.12.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2006 | 30.04.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO02064586 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [PX] 1 * examples 20-22; claim 1 *; | [PX]WO02079193 (CYCLACEL LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1 * page 14, line 27 - page 15, line 19; claims 1,29-35 *; | [A]WO0157022 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * claims 1,10,13,14,16-24 *; | [A]WO0156993 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * claims 1,13,16-27 * |