EP1476164 - QUINOXALINONES AND THEIR USE ESPECIALLY IN THE TREATMENT OF CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2005/44] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERGÜDEN, Jens-Kerim Bertolt-Brecht-Str. 2 42489 Wülfrath / DE | 02 /
KOLKHOF, Peter Falkenberg 121 42113 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
CASTRO-PALOMINO, Julio CL Mossen Jacint Verdaguer 139 08330 Premia de Mar, Barcelona / ES | 04 /
KUHL, Alexander Im Langen Lohe 32 58093 Hagen / DE | 05 /
KAST, Raimund Nachtigallenweg 79 42349 Wuppertal / DE | 06 /
STASCH, Johannes-Peter Alfred-Nobel-Str. 109 42651 Solingen / DE | 07 /
TINEL, Hanna Westfalenweg 14 42111 Wuppertal / DE | 08 /
MÜNTER, Klaus Memeler Str. 54 42489 Wülfrath / DE | 09 /
LUSTIG, Klemens Falkenberg 159 42113 Wuppertal / DE | 10 /
PERNERSTORFER, Josef Gerresheimerstr. 9 40721 Hilden / DE | 11 /
BECHEM, Martin Hans-Böckler-Str. 102 42111 Wuppertal / DE | 12 /
HÜSER, Jörg An der Bük 10 42327 Wuppertal / DE | [2004/47] | Application number, filing date | 03737277.8 | 27.01.2003 | [2004/47] | WO2003EP00782 | Priority number, date | DE2002105219 | 08.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10205219 | [2004/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03066057 | Date: | 14.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1476164 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1476164 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/498, C07D405/12, C07D401/12, C07D409/12, C07D403/12, A61P9/00 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D405/12 (EP);
C07D409/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/44] |
Former [2004/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHINOXALINONE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG INSBESONDERE IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON CARDIOVASKULAREN ERKRAUNKUNGEN | [2004/47] | English: | QUINOXALINONES AND THEIR USE ESPECIALLY IN THE TREATMENT OF CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES | [2004/47] | French: | QUINOXALINONES ET LEUR UTILISATION NOTAMMENT POUR TRAITER DES AFFECTIONS CARDIOVASCULAIRES | [2004/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 20.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE4341663 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1-9 * page 3, line 64 - line 68; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0345629 (THOMAE GMBH DR K [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 10, line 30 - page 13, line 54; claims 1,5,6 *; | [A]EP0556738 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 4, line 3 - line 13; claims 1,9,10 * |