EP1480796 - VENEER SLICER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danzer North America Inc. Suite 1704, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19801-1622 / US | [2004/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LACROIX, Wolfgang Eschenweg 9 72285 Pfalzgrafenweiler / DE | 02 /
TROST, Jürgen, F. 9025 Briarwood Court Canfield, OH 44406 / US | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03737571.4 | 31.01.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003US02870 | Priority number, date | US20020354236P | 04.02.2002 Original published format: US 354236 P | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03066295 | Date: | 14.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1480796 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1480796 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B27L5/02 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
B27L5/06 (EP,US);
B23Q1/5481 (EP,US);
B23Q5/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FURNIERMESSERMASCHINE | [2004/49] | English: | VENEER SLICER | [2004/49] | French: | SEPARATEUR DE CONTRE-PLAQUE | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 08.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.06.2008 | BE | 11.06.2008 | CY | 11.06.2008 | DK | 11.06.2008 | EE | 11.06.2008 | FI | 11.06.2008 | NL | 11.06.2008 | SI | 11.06.2008 | SK | 11.06.2008 | TR | 11.06.2008 | BG | 11.09.2008 | SE | 11.09.2008 | GR | 12.09.2008 | ES | 22.09.2008 | PT | 11.11.2008 | HU | 12.12.2008 | CH | 31.01.2009 | GB | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | LU | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | FR | 02.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
GR | 12.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
HU | 12.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
GB | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
LU | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
GR | 12.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
GB | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
LU | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
GR | 12.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
GB | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
GB | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
GB | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 11.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US674562 (KRAUS FRIEDRICH [DE]) [A] 1-40 * page 1, lines 37-63; figure 1 *; | [A]US2592782 (ZWEIFEL GEORGE E, et al) [A] 1-40 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 3 * * column 2, lines 43-45 ** figure - *; | [X]DE2501936 (KELLER & CO C) [X] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2540992 (KELLER & CO C) [A] 1-40 * figure - * | International search | [A]US793306 (KOSS LOUIS [US]); | [X]US2676627 (RALPH MCFALL CHARLES); | [Y]US3905408 (HALE THOMAS F); | [Y]US4287462 (BECK THOMAS L, et al); | [A]US4587616 (WEIL GEORGE [CA]); | [A]US4601317 (BRAND ROBERT D [US]); | [A]US5333658 (ALBION STEPHEN R [US], et al); | [X]US5680887 (BRAND ROBERT D [US]) |