EP1520112 - DEVICE TO RELIEVE THRUST LOAD IN A ROTOR-BEARING SYSTEM USING PERMANENT MAGNETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danfoss A/S Nordborgvej 81 6430 Nordborg / DK | [2015/16] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Turbocor Inc. 7575 Trans-Canada Highway Suite 500 St-Laurent H4T 1V6 (Québec) / CA | ||
Former [2005/14] | For all designated states Turbocor Inc. 1850 Trans-Canada Doval, Quebec H9P 2N4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Lin, Xiang 12 Place Lacroix Kirkland, Québec H9J 3W5 / CA | 02 /
LIN, Huai, Yu 10 Des Cèdres Kirkland, Québec H9J 4A6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | 01 /
SUN, Lin, Xiang 12 Place Lacroix Kirkland, Quebec H9J 3W5 / CA | ||
02 /
LIN, Huai, Yu 10 Des Cèdres Kirkland, Québec H9J 4A6 / CA | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2005/14] | Isenbruck, Günter, Dr. Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03737780.1 | 18.06.2003 | [2005/14] | WO2003CA00926 | Priority number, date | US20020394528P | 10.07.2002 Original published format: US 394528 P | [2005/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004007984 | Date: | 22.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1520112 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16C39/06, // F16C25/00 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
F16C39/066 (EP,US);
F16C39/06 (KR);
F16C32/0417 (EP,US);
F16C32/0427 (EP,US);
F16C39/063 (EP,US);
F16C2233/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/14] | F16C39/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTLASTUNG EINER ROTOR-LAGERANORDNUNG IN AXIALRICHTUNG MITTELS DAUERMAGNETEN | [2005/14] | English: | DEVICE TO RELIEVE THRUST LOAD IN A ROTOR-BEARING SYSTEM USING PERMANENT MAGNETS | [2005/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF REDUISANT LA CHARGE AXIALE DANS UN SYSTEME DE PALIER DE ROTOR AU MOYEN D'AIMANTS PERMANENTS | [2005/14] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 03.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2018 | 06.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/02] | 21.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4167295 (GLASER JERRY) [X] 1-3,10-12,15,16,18-23,30,33 * column 2, line 35 - column 4, line 26; figures 1,2 * [Y] 8,9,13,14,28,29,31,32; | [X]US6191515 (POST RICHARD F [US]) [X] 1,2,4,10-12,15-22,24,30,33 * column 9, line 50 - column 10, line 29; figures 6A,6B *; | [X]GB2335242 (COPAL ELECTRONICS [JP]) [X] 1-7,10,12,15-21,23-27,30,33 * page 6, line 10 - page 13, line 1; figures 1-6 *; | [X]DE19500935 (INST MASCHINENELEMENTE UNI STU [DE]) [X] 1-6,10-12,15-26,30,33 * column 4, line 3 - line 49; figure 1 *; | [X]GB1163632 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,10-12,15-25,27,30,33 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9831947 (SKF GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7,12,15-20,23-25,27,30,33 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0266991 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-3,10,11,15,18-23,33 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5710470 (KOMATA KIMIO [JP], et al) [Y] 8,28 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 25; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US5360470 (ONO YOSHINOBU [JP], et al) [Y] 9,29 * column 4, line 29 - line 41; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US5291975 (JOHNSON BRUCE G [US], et al) [Y] 13,14,31,32 * column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 18; figures 1-3 * |