EP1526767 - GEAR ASSEMBLY, SEEDING MACHINE, AND SEED CONTAINER COMPRISING SUCH A GEAR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | ||
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIESTAD, Michael, Eric 9 Watch Hill Road Rock Island, IL 61201 / US | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke, et al John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | Holst, Sönke, Dr., et al Deere & Company, European Office, Patent Department Steubenstrasse 36-42 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03738103.5 | 01.07.2003 | [2005/18] | WO2003EP06959 | Priority number, date | US20020214968 | 08.08.2002 Original published format: US 214968 | [2005/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004017713 | Date: | 04.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1526767 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1526767 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01C19/00, A01C15/00 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
A01C15/006 (EP,US);
A01C19/00 (EP,US);
Y10S111/921 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, HU, IT [2005/48] |
Former [2005/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRIEBEANORDNUNG, SÄMASCHINE UND SAATGUTBEHÄLTER MIT EINER SOLCHEN GETRIEBEANORDNUNG | [2005/18] | English: | GEAR ASSEMBLY, SEEDING MACHINE, AND SEED CONTAINER COMPRISING SUCH A GEAR ASSEMBLY | [2005/18] | French: | MECANISME DE TRANSMISSION, SEMOIR ET RESERVOIR DE SEMENCES EQUIPES D'UN TEL MECANISME | [2005/18] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 10.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB899733 (MASSEY FERGUSON SA) [X] 1,2,8,9 * page 1, lines 19-36 * * page 1, lines 83-90 * * page 2, lines 1-46 * * figure -; claim - * [A] 10; | [A]US2923444 (ORENDORFF JOHN W); | [A]WO0051412 (DEERE & CO [DE]); | [AD]US4779471 (RETTIG VERNON E [US]) | by applicant | US718664 | US4779471 |