EP1507573 - USE OF DOCETAXEL/DOXORUBICIN/CYCLOPHOSPHAMIDE IN ADJUVANT THERAPY OF BREAST AND OVARIAN CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma S.A. 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | [2005/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAKROUN, Hichem 5, Parc Delattre de Tassigny F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2005/08] | Le Pennec, Magali Aventis Pharma S.A. Direction des Brevets, Tri LEO/144 20, Avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03738122.5 | 15.05.2003 | [2005/08] | WO2003EP07443 | Priority number, date | US20020380850P | 17.05.2002 Original published format: US 380850 P | [2005/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03097164 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1507573 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61P35/00, A61K31/337, A61K31/351, A61K31/675 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
A61K31/66 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/351 (EP,US);
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,KR,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/337, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/351, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/66, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/675, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/08] | Extension states | AL | 17.12.2004 | LT | 17.12.2004 | LV | 17.12.2004 | MK | 17.12.2004 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON DOCETAXEL/DOXORUBICIN/CYCLOPHOSPHAMIDE IN DER ADJUVANS-THERAPIE VON BRUST- UND OVARIALKREBS | [2005/08] | English: | USE OF DOCETAXEL/DOXORUBICIN/CYCLOPHOSPHAMIDE IN ADJUVANT THERAPY OF BREAST AND OVARIAN CANCER | [2005/08] | French: | UTILISATION DE DOCETAXEL/DOXORUBICINE/CYCLOPHOSPHAMIDE DANS LA THERAPIE ADJUVANTE DU CANCER DU SEIN OU DE L'OVAIRE | [2005/08] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 26.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 06.03.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.04.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/20] | 08.04.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.04.2013 | 10.04.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Appeal following examination | 12.05.2009 | Appeal received No. T1902/09 | 16.07.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.07.2012 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2012/30] | 05.04.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX] - JACKISCH CHRISTIAN ET AL, "Dose-dense biweekly doxorubicin/docetaxel versus sequential neoadjuvant chemotherapy with doxorubicin/cyclophosphamide/docetaxel in operable breast cancer: second interim analysis.", CLINICAL BREAST CANCER. UNITED STATES OCT 2002, (200210), vol. 3, no. 4, ISSN 1526-8209, pages 276 - 280, XP001154935 [PX] 1-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3816/CBC.2002.n.031 | [PX] - NABHOLTZ JEAN-MARC ET AL, "Docetaxel and doxorubicin compared with doxorubicin and cyclophosphamide as first-line chemotherapy for metastatic breast cancer: results of a randomized, multicenter, phase III trial.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY: OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY. UNITED STATES 15 MAR 2003, (20030315), vol. 21, no. 6, ISSN 0732-183X, pages 968 - 975, XP009017054 [PX] 1-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/JCO.2003.04.040 | [PX] - SMITH I E, "New drugs for breast cancer", LANCET, XX, XX, (20020907), vol. 360, no. 9335, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 790 - 792, XP004379895 [PX] 1-11 * page 790, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(02)09903-8 | [PX] - PEREZ E A ET AL, "A randomized phase II study of sequential docetaxel and doxorubicin/cyclophosphamide in patients with metastatic breast cancer.", ANNALS OF ONCOLOGY: OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN SOCIETY FOR MEDICAL ONCOLOGY / ESMO. ENGLAND AUG 2002, (200208), vol. 13, no. 8, ISSN 0923-7534, pages 1225 - 1235, XP009017055 [PX] 1-11 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/annonc/mdf222 | [PX] - SMITH ROY E ET AL, "Phase II trial of doxorubicin/docetaxel/cyclophosphamide for locally advanced and metastatic breast cancer: results from NSABP trial BP-58.", CLINICAL BREAST CANCER. UNITED STATES DEC 2002, (200212), vol. 3, no. 5, ISSN 1526-8209, pages 333 - 340, XP001155014 [PX] 1-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3816/CBC.2002.n.036 | [PX] - NABHOLTZ JEAN-MARC ET AL, "Phase III trial comparing granulocyte colony-stimulating factor to leridistim in the prevention of neutropenic complications in breast cancer patients treated with docetaxel/doxorubicin/cyclophosphamide: results of the BCIRG 004 trial.", CLINICAL BREAST CANCER. UNITED STATES OCT 2002, (200210), vol. 3, no. 4, ISSN 1526-8209, pages 268 - 275, XP001154933 [PX] 1-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3816/CBC.2002.n.030 | [PX] - NABHOLTZ JEAN-MARC A ET AL, "Docetaxel in the treatment of breast cancer: An update on recent studies.", SEMINARS IN ONCOLOGY, (200206), vol. 29, no. 3 Suppl. 12, ISSN 0093-7754, pages 28 - 34, XP009017033 [PX] 1-11 * page 31, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/sonc.2002.34262 | [X] - IKEDA T ET AL, "Neoadjuvant chemotherapy with alternating sequential docetaxel (DOC) and Doxorubicin/Cyclophosphamide (AC) in locally advanced breast cancer (LABC): A pilot study.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, 2nd European Breast Cancer Conference;Brussels, Belgium; September 26-30, 2000, (200009), vol. 36, no. Supplement 5, ISSN 0959-8049, page S78, XP009017013 [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [X] - MAMOUNAS E P, "NSABP Protocol B-27. Preoperative doxorubicin plus cyclophosphamide followed by preoperative or postoperative docetaxel.", ONCOLOGY (WILLISTON PARK, N.Y.) UNITED STATES JUN 1997, (199706), vol. 11, no. 6 Suppl 6, ISSN 0890-9091, pages 37 - 40, XP009017057 [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [X] - "Neoadjuvant docetaxel augments the efficacy of preoperative doxorubicin/cyclophosphamide in operable breast cancer: First results of NSABP B-27", CLINICAL BREAST CANCER 2002 UNITED STATES, (2002), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 1526-8209, pages 26 - 28, XP001155019 [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [X] - DI LEO A ET AL, "A feasibility study evaluating docetaxel-based sequential and combination regimens in the adjuvant therapy of node-positive breast cancer.", ANNALS OF ONCOLOGY: OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN SOCIETY FOR MEDICAL ONCOLOGY / ESMO. NETHERLANDS FEB 2000, (200002), vol. 11, no. 2, ISSN 0923-7534, pages 169 - 175, XP009017036 [X] 1-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008345432342 | [X] - D'ORAZIO A I, "Improvement in disease-free survival with doxorubicin/docetaxel/cyclo phosphamide (TAC) versus 5-fluorouracil/doxorubicin/cyclophosphamide (FAC) as adjuvant therapy for node-positive breast cancer", CLINICAL BREAST CANCER 2002 UNITED STATES, (2002), vol. 3, no. 2, ISSN 1526-8209, pages 103 - 105, XP001154934 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * | [X] - ANTON A ET AL, "Sequential treatment of docetaxel plus doxorubicin/ cyclophosphamide (AC) as first-line chemotherapy for metastatic breast cancer (MBC). Final results and survival analysis of a phase II study", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (200203), vol. 38, ISSN 0959-8049, pages S68 - S69, XP004367963 [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [X] - NABHOLTZ JEAN-MARC ET AL, "Taxane-based three-drug combination in metastatic and adjuvant treatment of breast cancer.", SEMINARS IN ONCOLOGY, (199810), vol. 25, no. 5 SUPPL. 12, ISSN 0093-7754, pages 27 - 31, XP009017030 [X] 1-11 * abstract * | [X] - NABHOLTZ JEAN-MARC ET AL, "Docetaxel and anthracycline polychemotherapy in the treatment of breast cancer.", SEMINARS IN ONCOLOGY, (199906), vol. 26, no. 3 SUPPL. 8, ISSN 0093-7754, pages 47 - 52, XP009017031 [X] 1-11 * page 50, column 2 - page 51, column 1 * | [X] - NABHOLTZ JEAN-MARC ET AL, "Review of docetaxel and doxorubicin-based combinations in the management of breast cancer: From metastatic to adjuvant setting.", SEMINARS IN ONCOLOGY, (199902), vol. 26, no. 1 SUPPL. 3, ISSN 0093-7754, pages 10 - 16, XP009017032 [X] 1-11 * page 15, column 1 * | [X] - NABHOLTZ J M ET AL, "Docetaxel/doxorubicin/cyclophosphamide in the treatment of metastatic breast cancer.", ONCOLOGY (WILLISTON PARK, N.Y.) UNITED STATES AUG 1997, (199708), vol. 11, no. 8 Suppl 8, ISSN 0890-9091, pages 37 - 41, XP009017034 [X] 1-11 * page 51, column 1, paragraph 2 * | by applicant | EP0253738 | WO9209589 | - FRANCO CAVELLI ET AL., Textbook of Medical Oncology, MARTIN DUNITZ LTD., (1997), page 4623 | - FUMOLEAU ET AL., BULL. CANCER, (1995), vol. 82, no. 8, pages 629 - 636 |