EP1595236 - TELEMETRY SIGNAL COLLECTION, PROCESS AND PROVISION EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kintec SA 78 Vouliagmenis Ave. Voula, Athens 16673 / GR | [2005/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSIGIROGLOU, Kiriakos 78 Vouliagmenis Ave. Voula, Athens 16673 / GR | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | Theodorakis, Emmanouil 5 Gladstonos Street Athens 10677 / GR | [2005/46] | Application number, filing date | 03738353.6 | 10.07.2003 | [2005/46] | WO2003GR00029 | Priority number, date | GR20020100328 | 10.07.2002 Original published format: GR 2002100328 | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004008410 | Date: | 22.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1595236 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1595236 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/08 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
G08B25/08 (EP,US);
H05K1/18 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09972 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10689 (EP,US);
Y10T292/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/46] | Extension states | AL | 03.02.2005 | LT | 03.02.2005 | LV | 03.02.2005 | MK | 03.02.2005 | Title | German: | TELEMETRIEANLAGE ZUR AUFNAHME, VERARBEITUNG UND WEITERLEITUNG VON SIGNALEN | [2005/46] | English: | TELEMETRY SIGNAL COLLECTION, PROCESS AND PROVISION EQUIPMENT | [2005/46] | French: | EQUIPEMENT DE COLLECTE, DE TRAITEMENT ET DE FOURNITURE DE SIGNAUX DE TELEMESURE | [2005/46] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 23.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.10.2006 | 31.07.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.05.2008 | CZ | 21.05.2008 | EE | 21.05.2008 | NL | 21.05.2008 | SI | 21.05.2008 | SK | 21.05.2008 | IE | 10.07.2008 | TR | 10.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | GB | 21.08.2008 | [2015/21] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 21.05.2008 | |
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 10.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
GB | 21.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 10.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
GB | 21.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
IE | 10.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 21.05.2008 | |
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | NL | 21.05.2008 | |
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 21.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5291607 (RISTIC LJUBISA [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *[A] 2-10 |