EP1553566 - OPTICAL DISC, OPTICAL DISC RECORDING DEVICE, OPTICAL DISC RECORDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIDA, Takashi 13-14, Hashimotoisoku Yawata-shi, Kyoto 614-8331 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Motoshi 3-17-25-302, Furuichi Joto-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 536-0001 / JP | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03738569.7 | 30.06.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003JP08262 | Priority number, date | JP20020192192 | 01.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002192192 | JP20020310094 | 24.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002310094 | [2005/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004003897 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1553566 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1553566 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/0045, G11B7/007, G11B7/24, G11B20/12 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (EP,US);
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B7/126 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1221 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1232 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1294 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2537 (EP,US);
G11B7/00456 (EP,US);
G11B7/0062 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/42] |
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHER DATENTRÄGER, AUFZEICHNUNGSEINRICHTUNG MIT OPTISCHEM DATENTRÄGER, AUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN MIT OPTISCHEM DATENTRÄGER | [2005/28] | English: | OPTICAL DISC, OPTICAL DISC RECORDING DEVICE, OPTICAL DISC RECORDING METHOD | [2005/28] | French: | DISQUE OPTIQUE, DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT DE DISQUE OPTIQUE, PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT DE DISQUE OPTIQUE | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2005 | Translation filed | 01.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 13.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10157113.1 / EP2209118 | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0984441 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1* paragraphs [0200] - [0202]; figure 34 *; | [XA]EP1035539 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraphs [0051] - [0062] - [0086] - [0107] - [0114] - [0127]; figures 1,5,6,8 * [A] 2,7-10; | [X]US2001036136 (FUKUSHIMA TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0137] - [0142]; figure 4 * | International search | [Y]JPS5873022 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2000322818 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001331945 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | EP1035539 |