EP1552054 - A METHOD AND A DRY-END SECTION OF PAPER-MAKING MACHINE FOR PRODUCING A TISSUE PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Paper Karlstad Aktiebolag Box 1014 651 15 Karlstad / SE | [2005/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLERELID, Ingvar, Berndt, Erik Millensgatan 2 S-654 55 Karlstad / SE | 02 /
ÖNNERLÖV, Lars-Erik, Roland Anna Svärds väg 1 S-653 46 Karlstad / SE | 03 /
VIDEGREN, Leif, Sören Verkstadsgatan 8 B S-652 19 Karlstad / SE | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Lundquist, Lars-Olof, et al L-O Lundquist Patentbyra AB Box 80 651 03 Karlstad / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | Lundquist, Lars-Olof, et al L-O Lundquist Patentbyra AB, Box 80 651 03 Karlstad / SE | ||
Former [2005/28] | Lundquist, Lars-Olof L-O Lundquist Patentbyra AB, Box 80 651 03 Karlstad / SE | Application number, filing date | 03738820.4 | 10.06.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003SE00948 | Priority number, date | US20020167336 | 11.06.2002 Original published format: US 167336 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03104551 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1552054 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1552054 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 18.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D21F5/00, D21F5/18, D21F9/00 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
D21F11/145 (EP,US);
B65H19/28 (EP,US);
D21F11/006 (EP,US);
D21F11/14 (EP,US);
D21F5/182 (EP,US);
D21G9/0063 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41425 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41426 (EP,US);
B65H2301/522 (EP,US);
B65H2801/84 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, GB, IT, SE [2005/39] |
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND TROCKENPARTIE EINER PAPIERMASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TISSUEPAPIER | [2005/28] | English: | A METHOD AND A DRY-END SECTION OF PAPER-MAKING MACHINE FOR PRODUCING A TISSUE PAPER | [2005/28] | French: | PARTIE SECHE DE MACHINE A PAPIER PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE UN PAPIER MOUSSELINE, ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 03.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 28.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05000006.6 / EP1538259 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2005 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 12.10.2011 | GB | 10.06.2012 | [2013/21] |
Former [2012/24] | SE | 12.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3432936 (COLE RICHARD I, et al); | [Y]US3807056 (NORFOLK D); | [A]GB1389992 (VALMET OY); | [A]WO9624718 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]); | [A]WO0144568 (VALMET KARLSTAD AB [SE], et al) |