EP1521570 - ORAL DOSAGE FORM COMPRISING A LIQUID ACTIVE AGENT FORMULATION AND CONTROLLING RELEASE THEREOF BY AN EXPANDABLE OSMOTIC COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALZA Corporation One Johnson & Johnson Plaza, WH 3221 New Brunswick, NJ 08933 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states Alza Corporation, c/o Johnson & Johnson One Johnson & Johnson Plaza, WH 3221 New Brunswick, NJ 08933 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONG, Liang-Chang 181 Leota Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 02 /
SHAFI, Keru 50 Amador Village 13 Hayward, CA 94544 / US | 03 /
YUM, Alicia 2625 Carlmont Drive Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 04 /
WONG, Patrick, S., L. 1533 Burlingame Avenue Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2005/15] | 01 /
DONG, Liang-Chang 181 Leota Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | ||
02 /
SHAFI, Keru 50 Amador Village #13 Hayward, CA 94544 / US | |||
03 /
YUM, Alicia 2625 Carlmont Drive Belmont, CA 94002 / US | |||
04 /
WONG, Patrick, S., L. 1533 Burlingame Avenue Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/15] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03739346.9 | 27.06.2003 | [2005/15] | WO2003US20422 | Priority number, date | US20020392774P | 28.06.2002 Original published format: US 392774 P | [2005/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004002448 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1521570 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/48, A61K31/167, A61K31/57 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
A61K31/57 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K9/0004 (EP,US);
A61K9/48 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORALE DOSISFORM, DIE EINE FLÜSSIGE FORMULIERUNG EINES WIRKSTOFFES ENTHÄLT UND DESSEN KONTROLLIERTE FREISETZUNG ÜBER EINE ERWEITERUNGSFÄHIGE OSMOTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG GESTEUERT WIRD | [2008/46] | English: | ORAL DOSAGE FORM COMPRISING A LIQUID ACTIVE AGENT FORMULATION AND CONTROLLING RELEASE THEREOF BY AN EXPANDABLE OSMOTIC COMPOSITION | [2005/15] | French: | FORME POSOLOGIQUE ORALE COMPRENANT UNE PREPARATION DE PRINCIPE ACTIF LIQUIDE ET LIBERATION PROLONGEE DE CELLE-CI PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE D'UNE COMPOSITION OSMOTIQUE EXPANSIBLE | [2005/15] |
Former [2005/15] | ORALE DOSISFORM, DIE EINE FLÜSSIGE FORMULIERUNG EINES WIRKSTOFFES ENTHÄLT UND DESSEN FREISETZUNG ÜBER EINE ERWEITERUNGSFÄHIGE OSMOSEZUSAMMENSETZUNG STEUERT | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 02.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 20.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4111202 (THEEUWES FELIX) [A] 1-36 * figure 6 * * column 8 - column 13, paragraph 58 * * claims 1,2,6,8-15,18,22-24 *; | [A]US5034229 (MAGRUDER JUDY A [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * figures 5-11 * * column 6, line 50 - column 18, line 51 * * claims 1-4 *; | [A]WO9820930 (ALZA CORP [US]) [A] 1-36 * claims 1-21 * * figure 1 * * page 5, line 9 - page 7, line 16 ** pages 11-17 *; | [X]US5830502 (DONG LIANG C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11-16,24-28,36 * columns 3-7 * * claims 1-8 * * claims 12-18 *; | [XY]WO0013674 (ALZA CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,11-16,24-28,36 * page 9, line 18 - page 12, line 15 * * page 14, line 28 - page 16, line 27 * * claims 1-14 * * figures 2-4 * [Y] 1-36; | [Y]WO0038655 (ALZA CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-36 * figures 6,7 * * example 12 * * page 25, line 17 - line 21 * * page 26, line 20 - line 23 * * page 27, line 7 - line 32 * * pages 28-29 * * page 37, lines 9-32 * * page 38 - page 41, line 5 * * page 41, line 23 - page 45, line 18 * * page 47, line 10 - page 50, line 11 * * page 98, line 29 - page 106, line 10 * * page 108, line 14 - page 111, line 25 * * claims 41-53 *; | [X]WO0141742 (ALZA CORP [US]) [X] 1,4-6,8-13,17-19,21-25,29-31,33-36 * claims 1-10,13,18-26 * * example 1 * * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 26 * * page 7, line 29 - page 10 * * page 13, line 22 - page 21 *; | [X]US2001036472 (WONG PATRICK S-L [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8-13,17-19,21-25,29-31,33-36 * claims 1-20 * * figures 2,7,10 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0102] * |