EP1478290 - DEVICE FOR EXTERNALLY IMMOBILIZING BROKEN BONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Werding, Gerd Michael-Beer-Str. 10 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | For all designated states Schneider, Willi Hungerberg 30 72411 Bodelshausen / DE | [2004/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Kilian, Helmut Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Kilian, Helmut, Dr. Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03739462.4 | 10.02.2003 | [2004/48] | WO2003EP01295 | Priority number, date | DE2002202048U | 11.02.2002 Original published format: DE 20202048 U | [2004/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03068085 | Date: | 21.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1478290 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/64 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
A61B17/6416 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00858 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR EXTERNEN FIXIERUNG VON GEBROCHENEN KNOCHEN | [2004/48] | English: | DEVICE FOR EXTERNALLY IMMOBILIZING BROKEN BONES | [2004/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION EXTERNE D'OS CASSES | [2004/48] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 22.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/30] | 11.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR2715825 (SOPRANE SA [FR]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 2 - page 3, line 12; figures 3,5 * [Y] 2; | [Y]US6127596 (BROWN STEVE [US], et al) [Y] 2 * column 4, line 15 - line 39 *; | [A]DE2657303 (HAEMMERLE HELMUT) [A] 1-3 * page 14, line 4 - line 6 *; | [A]WO9716128 (NESTOROV STANISLAV GEORGIEV [BG]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |