EP1485438 - AQUEOUS COATING AGENT BASED ON EPOXYBUTENE POLYETHERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience LLC 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience LLC 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELCHIORS, Martin Am Sandberg 35 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 02 /
WEIKARD, Jan Bergstr. 115a 51519 Odenthal / DE | 03 /
GERTZMANN, Rolf Karl-Jaspers-Str. 57 51377 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
GREIVING, Helmut Schützenstrasse 134c 40723 Hilden / DE | 05 /
FREUDENBERG, Ulrich Hahnenstr. 85 50259 Pulheim / DE | 06 /
MILLER, Peter, J. 119 Brittany Dr. Kingsport, TN 37615 / US | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Feldhues, Michael L.F. Bayer MaterialScience AG LP-PL 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Feldhues, Michael, Dr. c/o Bayer MaterialScience AG, Law & Patents Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03739501.9 | 18.02.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003EP01613 | Priority number, date | DE2002106565 | 18.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10206565 | US20030368194 | 18.02.2003 Original published format: US 368194 | [2004/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03068879 | Date: | 21.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1485438 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09D175/14, C08G18/08, C08G18/40, C08G18/48 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
C09D175/14 (EP);
C08G18/0823 (EP);
C08G18/12 (EP);
C08G18/6625 (EP);
C08G18/6795 (EP);
C08G65/14 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/3231 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] |
Former [2004/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE BESCHICHTUNGSMITTEL AUF BASIS VON EPOXYBUTEN-POLYETHERN | [2004/51] | English: | AQUEOUS COATING AGENT BASED ON EPOXYBUTENE POLYETHERS | [2004/51] | French: | AGENTS DE REVETEMENT AQUEUX A BASE DE EPOXYBUTENE-POLYETHERS | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 10.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/41] | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3991036 (NUDENBERG WALTER ET AL) [X] 1,3,6,8,9,11,16 * column 10, line 6 - line 19; example 4E * * column 12, line 45 - column 13, line 6; example 8 * * table 1 *; | [Y]DE19930961 (BAYER AG) [Y] 1-3,6-11,14,16 * page 4, line 31 - line 54; example 1 * * page 5, line 58 - page 6, line 3 *; | [DY]WO0066649 (SLEGEIR WILLIAM ANTHONY ;LIU YAO CHING (US); EASTMAN CHEM CO (US);) [DY] 1-3,6-11,14,16 * claims 1,19 * * page 2, line 10 - line 13 * * page 14, line 5 - line 11 * * page 30, line 12 - line 13 * |