EP1483685 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ENABLING CONNECTIVITY TO A DATA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siebel Systems, Inc. 2207 Bridgestone Parkway San Mateo, CA 94404 / US | [2004/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEORGE, David 14648 NE 16th Street Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | 02 /
HARB, Joseph 14643 NE 174th Street Woodinville, WA 98074 / US | 03 /
HAVEN, Chris 3214 NE 98th Street Seattle, WA 98115 / US | 04 /
FERRY, Dennis 20202 72nd Drive SE Snohomish, WA 98296 / US | 05 /
LEE, Wen-Hsin 25732 SE 42st Street Issaquah, WA 98029 / US | 06 /
SRINIVASAN, Jaya 12840 SE 40st CT, E2 Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Molyneaux, Martyn William Harrison Goddard Foote 40- 43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | Molyneaux, Martyn William Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2004/50] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 03739834.4 | 13.02.2003 | [2004/50] | WO2003US04802 | Priority number, date | US20020356713P | 13.02.2002 Original published format: US 356713 P | US20020131368 | 23.04.2002 Original published format: US 131368 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03069500 | Date: | 21.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1483685 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
G06F16/252 (EP,US);
G06F16/9577 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/50] | G06F17/21 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG DER KONNEKTIVITÄT ZU EINEM DATENSYSTEM | [2004/50] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ENABLING CONNECTIVITY TO A DATA SYSTEM | [2004/50] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT L'ACTIVATION DE LA CONNECTIVITE A UN SYSTEME DE DONNEES | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 30.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/22] | 11.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0056033 (ORACLE CORP [US]) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * page 8, line 33 - page 11, line 3 *; | [X]WO0077654 (BOW STREET SOFTWARE INC [US]) [X] 1-30 * page 32, line 11 - page 33, line 22 * * page 48, line 5 - page 54, line 17 *; | [A]US2001043234 (KOTAMARTI MALLIK [US]) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0014] *; | [X] - BHAVEN SHAH, "Presenting XML to the Web", XML JOURNAL, (200003), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1534-9780, pages 18 - 23, XP002211938 [X] 1-30 * page 19, column L, paragraph 3 - page 19, column R, line L * * figures 1,2 * | [X] - CAWSEY A, "Presenting tailored resource descriptions: will XSLT do the job?", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (200006), vol. 33, no. 1-6, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 713 - 722, XP004304803 [X] 1-30 * page 713, column L, paragraph 1 - page 717, column R, paragraph LAST * * page 721, column LEFT, paragraph L - page 721, column R, paragraph LAST * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-1286(00)00038-4 | [A] - INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION, "Parameterized XSL style sheets", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (199907), vol. 423, no. 110, ISSN 0374-4353, XP007124644 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * | International search | [XP]US2002073236 (HELGESON CHRISTOPHER S [US], et al); | [Y]US6336137 (LEE KING-HWA [US], et al); | [YP]US6507857 (YALCINALP L UMIT [US]); | [YP]US2002131404 (MEHTA SAMIR NARENDRA [US], et al) |