EP1553320 - ANTILOCK DISK BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huang, Tan-Cheng 6Fl., No.2-1, Swei St. Taichung, Taiwan 403 / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states Huang, Tan-Cheng 6Fl., No.2-1, Sweist Taichung Taiwan 403 / TW | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Huang, Tan-Cheng 6Fl., No.2-1, Sweist Taichung, Taiwan 403 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/28] | Wehnert, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Mozartstrasse 23 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03739989.6 | 14.07.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003CN00558 | Priority number, date | CN2002281655 | 15.10.2002 Original published format: CN 02281655 | CNX3200060 | 03.01.2003 Original published format: CN 3200060.X | [2005/28] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004036081 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1553320 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1553320 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16D55/224, B62L1/02 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
B60T8/3225 (EP,US);
B60T11/046 (EP,US);
B62L3/00 (EP,US);
F16D55/226 (EP,US);
F16D65/18 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0008 (EP,US);
F16D2121/14 (EP,US);
F16D2125/28 (EP,US);
F16D2125/36 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIBLOCKIERSCHEIBENBREMSE | [2005/28] | English: | ANTILOCK DISK BRAKE | [2005/28] | French: | FREIN A MAIN ANTIBLOCAGE | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2005 | Translation filed | 24.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2004 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 07.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.03.2007 | BE | 07.03.2007 | CH | 07.03.2007 | CY | 07.03.2007 | CZ | 07.03.2007 | DK | 07.03.2007 | EE | 07.03.2007 | FI | 07.03.2007 | IT | 07.03.2007 | LI | 07.03.2007 | NL | 07.03.2007 | RO | 07.03.2007 | SI | 07.03.2007 | SK | 07.03.2007 | TR | 07.03.2007 | BG | 07.06.2007 | SE | 07.06.2007 | GR | 08.06.2007 | ES | 18.06.2007 | LU | 14.07.2007 | IE | 16.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | PT | 07.08.2007 | HU | 08.09.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CY | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
BG | 07.06.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
LU | 14.07.2007 | ||
IE | 16.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CY | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
IE | 16.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
IE | 16.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
IE | 16.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
RO | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CH | 07.03.2007 | |
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE20008565U (CHEN TSE MIN [TW]) [A] 1-10* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5979609 (TSAI MING-TA [TW]); | [A]CN2440741Y (LI MINXIANG [CN]); | [A]US6349800 (NAKAMURA YASUSHI [JP]) |