EP1639497 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EXTRACTING CAUSAL INFORMATION FROM A CHAOTIC TIME SERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DyAnsys, Inc. c/o Emory & Howard Bay Park Plaza 577 Airport Blvd., Suite 610 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states DyANSys, Inc. c/o Emory & Howard Bay Park Plaza 577 Airport Blvd., Suite 610 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | ||
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states Lafitte, Melvyn Jérémie 13, rue de Versoix 01210 Ferney-Voltaire / FR | ||
For all designated states Sauvageot, Orin 6, Avenue Joli-Mont 1209 Geneva / CH | |||
For all designated states Fevre-Genoulaz, Marion 10B, rue du 18 aout 1944 74100 Annemasse / FR | |||
For all designated states Nageshwar, Srini 33, chemin de Bezaley 1247 Anieres / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lafitte, Melvyn, Jérémie 13, rue de Versoix 01210 Ferney-Voltaire / FR | 02 /
Sauvageot, Orin 6, avenue Joli-Mont 1209 Geneva / CH | 03 /
Fevre-Genoulaz, Marion 10B, rue du 18 aout 1944 74100 Annemasse / FR | 04 /
Nageshwar, Srini 33, chemin de Bezaley 1247 Anieres / CH | [2008/19] |
Former [2006/13] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Micheli & Cie SA Rue de Genève 122 Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thônex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Micheli & Cie 122, Rue de Genève, CP 61 1226 Thônex / CH | Application number, filing date | 03740863.0 | 27.06.2003 | [2006/13] | WO2003IB02522 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005001706 | Date: | 06.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1639497 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1639497 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
A61B5/02405 (EP,US);
A61B5/352 (EP,US);
A61B5/4035 (EP,US);
A61B5/413 (EP,US);
A61B5/4818 (EP,US);
A61B5/4821 (EP,US);
G06F2218/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/40] |
Former [2006/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EXTRAHIEREN KAUSALER INFORMATIONEN AUS EINER CHAOTISCHEN ZEITREIHE | [2006/13] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EXTRACTING CAUSAL INFORMATION FROM A CHAOTIC TIME SERIES | [2006/13] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR EXTRAIRE DES INFORMATIONS CAUSALES D'UNE SERIE CHRONOLOGIQUE CHAOTIQUE | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 21.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5285793 (SLOVUT DAVID P [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * abstract * * column 2, line 8 - line 68 * * column 4, line 3 - column 12, line 26 * * column 16, line 11 - column 17, line 51 * * claims 1,11 * * figures 1-15 *; | [Y]US5349962 (LOCKARD JOAN S [US], et al) [Y] 1-37 * abstract * * column 4, line 35 - column 6, line 64 * * claims 1,5,6 * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US5645070 (TURCOTT ROBERT [US]) [Y] 1-37 * abstract * * column 1, line 39 - column 3, line 27 * * column 3, line 54 - column 5, line 23 * * column 6, line 41 - line 64 * * claims 1-4 * * figures 1-3,7 *; | [A]US5971922 (ARITA SEIZABUROU [JP], et al) [A] 1-37 * abstract * * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 22 * * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 24 * * column 7, line 25 - column 9, line 27 * * claims 1,2,5 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A] - MORFILL G E ET AL, "KOMPLEXITAETSANALYSE IN DER KARDIOLOGIE", PHYSIKALISCHE BLATTER, PHYSIK VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, (19940201), vol. 50, no. 2, ISSN 0031-9279, pages 156 - 160, XP000674836 [A] 1-37 * abstract * * page 156 - page 159 * * figure 1 * | [A] - ABARBANEL H D I, "THE ANALYSIS OF OBSERVED CHAOTIC DATA IN PHYSICAL SYSTEMS", REVIEWS OF MODERN PHYSICS, AMERICAN PHYSICAL SOCIETY, US, (199310), vol. 65, no. 4, ISSN 0034-6861, pages 1331 - 1392, XP000937897 [A] 1-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/RevModPhys.65.1331 |