EP1636273 - SYNTHETIC THICKENERS FOR COSMETICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2022 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAMBERTI S.p.A. Via Piave 18 21041 Albizzate (Varese) / IT | [2006/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENETTI, Arianna Corso Leonardo Da Vinci, 61 I-21013 / IT | 02 /
POLOTTI, Gianmarco Viaa Fogagnolo, 89 I-20099 Sesti San Giovanni / IT | 03 /
FEDERICI, Franco Viale Stelvio, 49 I-21052 Busto Arsizio / IT | 04 /
LI BASSI, Giuseppe Via Stretti, 4 I-21026 Gavirate (VA) / IT | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Gislon, Gabriele Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Gislon, Gabriele Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga 16 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03741063.6 | 24.06.2003 | [2006/12] | WO2003IT00389 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004113393 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1636273 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1636273 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/32, C08F220/58 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
A61K8/8158 (EP,US);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/064 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C08F2/32 (EP,US);
C08F220/34 (EP,US);
C08F220/585 (EP,US);
A61Q1/02 (EP,US);
C08F220/06 (EP,US);
C08F222/385 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNTHETISCHE VERDICKUNGSMITTEL FÜR KOSMETIKA | [2006/12] | English: | SYNTHETIC THICKENERS FOR COSMETICS | [2006/12] | French: | EPAISSISSANTS SYNTHETIQUES POUR COSMETIQUES | [2006/12] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 04.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.02.2009
19.02.2009
ADMISSIBLE SOCIETE D'EXPLOITATION DE PRODUITS POUR L'INDUSTRIE CHIMIQUE, S.E.P.P.I.C 75 quai d'Orsay 75007 PARIS CEDEX 07 / FR Opponent's representative Conan, Philippe Claude, et al, et al L'Air Liquide SA Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.02.2009
SOCIETE D'EXPLOITATION DE PRODUITS POUR L'INDUSTRIE CHIMIQUE, S.E.P.P.I.C 75 quai d'Orsay 75007 PARIS CEDEX 07 / FR Opponent's representative Conan, Philippe Claude, et al, et al L'Air Liquide D.S.P.I. 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | 25.03.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.10.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.11.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.11.2011 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 18.12.2012 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2013/37] | Appeal following opposition | 19.01.2012 | Appeal received No. T0098/12 | 27.03.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.12.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 18.12.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.01.2013 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.2008 | CY | 14.05.2008 | CZ | 14.05.2008 | DK | 14.05.2008 | EE | 14.05.2008 | FI | 14.05.2008 | NL | 14.05.2008 | RO | 14.05.2008 | SI | 14.05.2008 | SK | 14.05.2008 | TR | 14.05.2008 | IE | 24.06.2008 | LU | 24.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | BG | 14.08.2008 | SE | 14.08.2008 | GR | 15.08.2008 | ES | 25.08.2008 | PT | 14.10.2008 | HU | 15.11.2008 | [2022/23] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CY | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
TR | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 24.06.2008 | ||
LU | 24.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
GR | 15.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
HU | 15.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CY | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
TR | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 24.06.2008 | ||
IT | 24.06.2008 | ||
LU | 24.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
GR | 15.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
HU | 15.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CY | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
TR | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 24.06.2008 | ||
IT | 24.06.2008 | ||
LU | 24.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
HU | 15.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CY | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 24.06.2008 | ||
IT | 24.06.2008 | ||
LU | 24.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
HU | 15.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 24.06.2008 | ||
IT | 24.06.2008 | ||
LU | 24.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 24.06.2008 | ||
IT | 24.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 24.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 14.05.2008 | |
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 14.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0503853 (SCOTT BADER CO [GB]); | [A]EP1059305 (CALGON CORP [US]) |