EP1643655 - COMMUNICATION TERMINAL DEVICE, POWER SUPPLY METHOD, AND POWER SUPPLY PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2006/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Shinichiro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Sunderland, James Harry Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | Sunderland, James Harry Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03741273.1 | 08.07.2003 | [2006/14] | WO2003JP08662 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005004342 | Date: | 13.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1643655 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38, H04M1/02, G06K19/077, H01Q1/24 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K19/0775 (EP,US);
G06K19/07771 (EP,US);
H01Q1/2283 (US);
H01Q1/242 (EP);
H01Q1/243 (EP);
H01Q1/245 (EP,US);
H01Q1/526 (EP,US);
H04B1/3816 (EP);
H04M1/0214 (EP,US);
H04M1/0245 (EP,US);
H04W52/0251 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/14] | H04B1/38, H04M1/02, G06K19/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/42] |
Former [2006/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, TR | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄTEEINRICHTUNG, STROMVERSORGUNGSVERFAHREN UND STROMVERSORGUNGSPROGRAMM | [2006/14] | English: | COMMUNICATION TERMINAL DEVICE, POWER SUPPLY METHOD, AND POWER SUPPLY PROGRAM | [2006/14] | French: | TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION, PROCEDE D'ALIMENTATION ELECTRIQUE ET SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION ELECTRIQUE | [2006/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2005 | Translation filed | 04.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 13.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/38] | 21.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/38] | 30.04.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP08157110.1 / EP1965505 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2245725 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 15,17,19 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 24 *; | [A]EP0518526 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 14,16,18* column 3, line 27 - line 49; figure 1 *; | [Y]GB2292866 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 15,17,19 * page 2, line 21 - line 31; figure 5 *; | [Y]WO9943040 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [Y] 5-10 * page 31, line 28 - page 32, line 27; figure 10e *; | [Y]US6202927 (BASHAN ODED [IL], et al) [Y] 15,17,19 * column 12, line 15 - line 29; figure 9 *; | [Y]EP1098388 (MAGCOM AS [NO]) [Y] 5-10 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0051]; figure 4 *; | [X]US6373447 (ROSTOKER MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 10, line 64 - column 11, line 33; figure 8 * * column 12, line 26 - line 32; figure 9b *; | [Y]WO02071328 (SCHLUMBERGER SYSTEMS & SERVICE [FR], et al) [Y] 15,17,19 * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 10; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1258943 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 14,16,18 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035]; figure 12 *; | [XY]WO02103923 (SMART CARD LAB INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,11-13 * the whole document * [Y] 5-10,15,17,19 | International search | [X]JP2003076971 (TOPPAN FORMS CO LTD); | [X]JP2001195553 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2003037861 (HITACHI CABLE); | [A]JP2002218031 (AI DENKI TSUSHIN KK, et al) |