EP1547743 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP | ||
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Prefecture 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAI, Sadaaki c/o NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03741502.3 | 18.07.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003JP09182 | Priority number, date | JP20020240853 | 21.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002240853 | [2005/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004018174 | Date: | 04.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1547743 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1547743 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B28B11/04, B01J35/04, B01D53/94, F01N3/022 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
F01N3/2828 (EP,US);
B01D53/86 (EP,US);
B01D53/885 (EP,US);
C04B35/195 (EP,US);
C04B35/6264 (EP,US);
C04B35/63 (EP,US);
C04B35/632 (EP,US);
C04B35/63408 (EP,US);
C04B35/63416 (EP,US);
C04B35/63488 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6021 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/96 (EP,US);
F01N2260/18 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/26] | B28B11/04, B01J35/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE [2005/50] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WABENSTRUKTUR | [2005/26] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE | [2005/26] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE STRUCTURE EN NID D'ABEILLE | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2005 | Translation filed | 24.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 26.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 09.09.2009 | [2010/28] | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]WO03024893 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al) [PA] 1-6* the whole document *; | [E]WO03078121 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [E]WO03090929 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1428808 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [E] 1-6 * paragraphs [0013] , [0015] , [0021] , [0024] , [0025] , [0038] - [0040] *; | [E]EP1486305 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [E] 1-6 * paragraphs [0011] , [0016] - [0018] - [0025] - [0029] - [0040] - [0047] - [0066] - [0083] * * figures 5a-5c *; | [E]EP1498179 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [E] 1-6 * paragraphs [0011] , [0027] , [0035] , [0054] - [0058] - [0065] - [0081] * | International search | [A]US6242072 (UEDA TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [AP]WO03024893 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al); | [AP]JP2003145523 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) |