EP1493589 - PRINTER AND PRINT SYSTEM, DATA RECEIVING DEVICE AND DATA SENDING/RECEIVING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMA, Toshihiro c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
GASSHO, Kazuhito c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
KOJIMA, Teruhito c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 03741540.3 | 22.07.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003JP09280 | Priority number, date | JP20020253410 | 30.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002253410 | JP20020253378 | 30.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002253378 | JP20020277384 | 24.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002277384 | JP20020277499 | 24.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002277499 | [2005/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004022350 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1493589 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B41J29/38, G06F1/00 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
G06F21/608 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2111 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | B41J29/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | DRUCKER UND DRUCKSYSTEM, DATENEMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG UND DATENSENDE/EMPFANGSSYSTEM | [2005/01] | English: | PRINTER AND PRINT SYSTEM, DATA RECEIVING DEVICE AND DATA SENDING/RECEIVING SYSTEM | [2005/01] | French: | IMPRIMANTE ET SYSTEME D'IMPRESSION, DISPOSITIF DE RECEPTION DE DONNEES ET SYSTEME D'ENVOI/RECEPTION DE DONNEES | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2004 | Translation filed | 04.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 14.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/12] | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6362893 (FRANCIS ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1-41 * abstract * * column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 62 * * column 7, line 1 - line 43 *; | [A]US2002064280 (GASSHO KAZUHITO [JP]) [A] 1-41 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 7 - page 2, paragraph 30 * * page 4, paragraph 75 - paragraph 76 * * page 5, paragraph 93 - paragraph 95 * * page 6, paragraph 102 - paragraph 113 * * page 7, paragraph 123 * * page 10, paragraph 165 - page 11, paragraph 177 *; | [A]EP1233331 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1-41 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 4 - paragraph 11 * * page 2, paragraph 17 - paragraph 19 * * page 6, paragraph 60 - paragraph 61 ** page 11, paragraph 138 - page 12, paragraph 149 * | International search | [A]JPH10341212 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2002359806 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2002334255 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) | Examination | WO0237222 |