EP1501671 - SILVER ALLOY THIN FILM REFLECTOR AND TRANSPARENT ELECTRICAL CONDUCTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Target Technology Company, LLC. 564 Wald Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2005/39] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states Target Technology Company, LLC. 17951 Sky Park Circle, Building 35, Suite A Irvine, California 92614 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEE, Han, H. 7 Sommet Newport Coast, CA 92657 / US | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03741791.2 | 08.05.2003 | [2005/05] | WO2003US14599 | Priority number, date | US20020378884P | 08.05.2002 Original published format: US 378884 P | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03096080 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1501671 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/08, G02B1/10, C23C14/18 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
G02B1/10 (EP,US);
C22C5/06 (EP,US);
C22C5/08 (EP,US);
C22C5/10 (EP,US);
C23C14/18 (EP,US);
C23C14/185 (EP,US);
G02B5/08 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/05] | B32B15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÜNNFILMSILBERLEGIERUNGSREFLEKTOR UND DURCHSICHTIGER ELEKTRISCHER LEITER | [2005/05] | English: | SILVER ALLOY THIN FILM REFLECTOR AND TRANSPARENT ELECTRICAL CONDUCTOR | [2005/05] | French: | REFLECTEUR SOUS FORME DE COUCHE MINCE EN ALLIAGE D'ARGENT ET CONDUCTEUR ELECTRIQUE TRANSPARENT | [2005/05] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/19] | 17.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4639096 (KITAGISHI NOZOMU [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 5 * * examples 1,3-6,11,19-22 * * claims 1,3 *; | [A]US5701206 (SASAKI TAKAMITSU [JP], et al) [A] 1-16* column 4, line 49 - line 54 *; | [X]EP0990928 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] *; | [X]US2002005928 (HANAKAWA MANABU [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0088] * * figure - *; | [A]US2002020924 (MUELLER PETER [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0059] * | International search | [Y]US6049419 (WHEATLEY JOHN A [US], et al); | [Y]US5153753 (OHTA EIICHI [JP], et al) | Examination | US4639069 |