EP1532670 - CHARACTERIZATION ADN REDUCTION OF VARIATION FOR INTEGRATED CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cadence Design Systems, Inc. 2655 Seely Avenue San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2007/52] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Praesagus, Inc. One Broadway, Suite 600 Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Taber, H. 1706, Cherry Hills Lane San Jose, CA 05125 / US | 02 /
WHITE, David 3656 Gavota Avenue San Jose, CA 95124 / US | 03 /
Mehrotra, Vikas 2000 Walnut Avenue, Apt. Q106 Fremont, CA 94358 / US | [2006/24] |
Former [2005/21] | 01 /
SMITH, Taber, H. 1945 Barrymore Cmn, J Fremont, CA 94358 / US | ||
02 /
WHITE, David 13 James Way Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | |||
03 /
Mehrotra, Vikas 2000 Walnut Avenue, Apt. Q106 Fremont, CA 94358 / US | Representative(s) | Molnia, David Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Molnia, David Dörries Frank-Molnia Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03741876.1 | 04.06.2003 | [2005/21] | WO2003US17655 | Priority number, date | US20020165214 | 07.06.2002 Original published format: US 165214 | US20020164844 | 07.06.2002 Original published format: US 164844 | US20020164847 | 07.06.2002 Original published format: US 164847 | US20020164842 | 07.06.2002 Original published format: US 164842 | US20020200660 | 22.07.2002 Original published format: US 200660 | US20020321283 | 17.12.2002 Original published format: US 321283 | US20020321298 | 17.12.2002 Original published format: US 321298 | US20020321281 | 17.12.2002 Original published format: US 321281 | US20020321777 | 17.12.2002 Original published format: US 321777 | US20020321290 | 17.12.2002 Original published format: US 321290 | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03104921 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1532670 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/302, G06F17/50 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
G06F30/39 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/21] | H01L21/302 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHARAKTERISIERUNG UND REDUKTION DER VARIATION F R INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNGEN | [2005/21] | English: | CHARACTERIZATION ADN REDUCTION OF VARIATION FOR INTEGRATED CIRCUITS | [2005/21] | French: | CARACTERISATION ET REDUCTION DE VARIATION POUR CIRCUITS INTEGRES | [2005/21] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 18.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/23] | 29.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5923563 (LAVIN MARK A [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 45 - line 67 *; | [A] - RUIQI TIAN ET AL, "Model-Based Dummy Feature Placement for Oxide Chemical-Mechanical Polishing Manufacturability", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTER AIDED DESIGN OF INTEGRATED CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200107), vol. 20, no. 7, ISSN 0278-0070, XP011008010 [A] 1-14 * page 903, column 1, line 5 - line 11 * * paragraphs [0002] - [003A] * * figures 1,3 * | [A] - YU CHEN ET AL, "Hierarchical dummy fill for process uniformity", DESIGN AUTOMATION CONFERENCE, 2001. PROCEEDINGS OF THE ASP-DAC 2001. ASIA AND SOUTH PACIFIC JAN. 30 - FEB. 2, 2001, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20010130), ISBN 0-7803-6633-6, pages 139 - 144, XP010537793 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - BONING D ET AL, "Pattern dependent modeling for CMP optimization and control", MATER RES SOC SYMP PROC; MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM - PROCEEDINGS 2000 MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY, WARRENDALE, PA, USA, (19990405), vol. 566, pages 197 - 209, XP007901983 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - STINE B E ET AL, "THE PHYSICAL AND ELECTRICAL EFFECTS OF METAL-FILL PATTERNING PROCTICES FOR OXIDE CHEMICAL-MECHANICAL POLISHING PROCESSES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISACATAWAY, NJ, US, (199803), vol. 45, no. 3, ISSN 0018-9383, pages 665 - 679, XP000738545 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/16.661228 | [PX] - OHTA T ET AL, "A new SP(simultaneous polishing) model for copper CMP process", SIMULATION OF SEMICONDUCTOR PROCESSES AND DEVICES, 2002. SISPAD 2002. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCRE ON SEPT. 4-6, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020904), ISBN 4-89114-027-5, pages 257 - 260, XP010603838 [PX] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document * | International search | [AE]US6751785 (OH SOO-YOUNG [US]); | [A]US6486066 (CLEEVES JAMES M [US], et al) |