EP1581377 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FEDERAL-MOGUL CORPORATION 26555 Northwestern Highway Southfield Michigan 48034 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states FEDERAL-MOGUL CORPORATION 26555 Northwestern Highway Southfield Michigan 48034 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Longtin, Scott 55 Linton Street Torrington, CT 06790 / US | 02 /
Carr, Stephen, J. 18340 Negaunee, Redford Township MI 48240 / US | 03 /
Hatch, Frederick, R. 1419 Brooklyn Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US | 04 /
Noteboom II, Ronald, Maurice 67325 Lowe Plank Lenox, MI48050 / US | 05 /
Chandler, Jon, A. 302 Lakeshore Drive Pawleys Island, SC 29595 / US | 06 /
Myers, Michael, J. 4311 John Brown Road Van Wert, OH 45891 / US | 07 /
Drake, Gary, B. P.O. Box 364 Convoy, OH 45832 / US | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03742171.6 | 25.06.2003 | [2005/40] | WO2003US19930 | Priority number, date | US20020191945 | 09.07.2002 Original published format: US 191945 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004005002 | Date: | 15.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1581377 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14, F16J15/32 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
F01D11/003 (EP,US);
B29C45/14336 (EP,US);
B29C45/14467 (EP,US);
B29D99/0053 (EP,US);
F02C7/28 (EP,US);
F16J15/328 (EP,US);
B29C2045/0058 (EP,US);
B29C2045/14459 (EP,US);
B29C43/18 (EP,US);
B29C45/0055 (EP,US);
B29K2021/00 (EP,US);
B29K2627/18 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/40] | B29C45/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, HU, IT [2005/44] |
Former [2005/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN F R EINE VERBUNDDICHTUNG | [2005/40] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE SEAL | [2005/40] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN JOINT ETANCHE A LEVRE COMPOSITE | [2005/40] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 05.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/26] | 09.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2585103 [ ]; | EP0197862 [ ]; | US4406847 [ ]; | [A]US4406847 (O'NEAL ROBERT D [US], et al); | [A]US4464322 (BUTLER JOHN D [US]); | [A]US4822058 (BUTLER JOHN D [US], et al); | [Y]US4957680 (SAXOD MICHEL [FR], et al); | [Y]US4995621 (DEVOUASSOUX SERGE [FR], et al); | [A]US5577741 (SINK DANNY R [US]) | International search | [A]US4738606 (CHRISTIANSEN KEITH W [US], et al); | [A]US4995621 (DEVOUASSOUX SERGE [FR], et al) |