EP1478275 - A DIAGNOSTIC APPARATUS WITH AN AUTOMATIC VISUALIZATION OF SCAN PLANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN VAALS, Johannes, J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SAZONOVA, Tatiana, B. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Cohen, Julius Simon Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Cohen, Julius Simon Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03742615.2 | 20.01.2003 | [2004/48] | WO2003IB00128 | Priority number, date | EP20020075682 | 20.02.2002 Original published format: EP 02075682 | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03070103 | Date: | 28.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1478275 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/08, A61B5/055, A61B6/03 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
G01R33/283 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
A61B6/08 (EP,US);
A61B6/587 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIAGNOSTISCHES GERÄT MIT AUTOMATISCHER VISUALISIERUNG VON SCANEBENEN | [2004/48] | English: | A DIAGNOSTIC APPARATUS WITH AN AUTOMATIC VISUALIZATION OF SCAN PLANES | [2004/48] | French: | APPAREIL DE DIAGNOSTIC A VISUALISATION AUTOMATIQUE DE PLANS DE BALAYAGE | [2004/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 21.05.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5365927 (ROEMER PETER B [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 2A,B * * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 36 *; | [DX]US6275721 (DARROW ROBERT DAVID [US], et al) [DX] 1 * abstract * * column 4, lines 29-46 * * column 8, lines 13-20 * * figure 3 *; | [X] - SILVERMAN S G ET AL, "INTERACTIVE MR-GUIDED BIOPSY IN AN OPEN-CONFIGURATION MR IMAGING SYSTEM", RADIOLOGY, (199510), vol. 197, no. 1, ISSN 0033-8419, pages 175 - 181, XP001022638 [X] 1 * abstract * * page 175 - page 178 * | [X] - SCHAEFFTER T ET AL, Automatic scan plane definition for frameless MR-stereotaxy on a clinical scanner using an active surgical device holder, 22.05.1999, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE. SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION, 1999, VOL. 3,, XP002151958 [X] 1 * page 1961 * | [A] - GERING, D. T. ET AL., "An Integrated Visualization System for Surgical Planning and Guidance Using Image Fusion and an Open MR", JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING, (2001), vol. 13, pages 967 - 975, XP002239881 [A] 1-4,6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jmri.1139 | by applicant | WO9810303 | US6275721 |