EP1486235 - DEVICE FOR REPLACING GUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nakane, Akifumi 9, Kon-nan-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 616-8056 / JP | For all designated states Iuchi, Haruko 17-2, Katanokami-cho, Babanokami Tokushima-shi Tokushima 770-8033 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Nakane, Akifumi 9, Kon-nan-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 616-8056 / JP | ||
For all designated states Iuchi, Haruko 17-2, Katanokami-cho, Babanokami Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 770-8033 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKANE, Akifumi 9, Kon-nan-cho, Hanazono, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 616-8056 / JP | 02 /
UEDA, Kazuo 58-66, Hirono-cho Terayama Uji-shi, Kyoto 611-0031 / JP | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2004/51] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 03742671.5 | 24.02.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003JP02004 | Priority number, date | JP20020048180 | 25.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002048180 | [2004/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03070330 | Date: | 28.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1486235 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A63B51/14 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
A63B51/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUBESAITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2004/51] | English: | DEVICE FOR REPLACING GUT | [2004/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE REMPLACER UN BOYAU DE RAQUETTE | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2004 | Translation filed | 25.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 25.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 01.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 10.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2154870 (SERRANO EDMUNDO H) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0034688 (SNAUWAERT & DEPLA BELGIUM [BE]) [A] 2,3,5* figures 1,7 *; | [A]EP0382652 (BABOLAT VS [FR]) [A] 2,3,5 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0473528 (MONAJ LEON PABLO [ES]) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5269515 (CHU DAVID T [TW]) [A] 2-4 * figures 6,7 *; | [X]WO0166198 (YOU MIN SUN [KR]) [X] 1,2,5 * page 12, paragraph LAST * * page 13, paragraph 1 * * figures 2-7 * | International search | [X]JPS5911018Y ; | [X]US4376535 (MUSELET ANDRE [FR], et al); | [X]JPS5925416Y |