EP1476500 - METHOD OF MAKING A NANOPOROUS FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Washington Street - 1790 Building Midland MI 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Washington Street, 1790 Building Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SO, Ying, Hung 1524 Dilloway Drive Midland, MI 48640 / US | 02 /
NIU, Qing, Shan, J. 305 West Chapel Midland, MI 48640 / US | 03 /
TOWNSEND, Paul, H., III 1102 Willard Street Midland, MI 48642 / US | 04 /
MARTIN, Steven, J. 3019 Scarborough Lane Midland, MI 48640 / US | 05 /
KALANTAR, Thomas, H. 1827 Eastlawn, H-11 Midland, MI 48642 / US | 06 /
GODSCHALX, James, P. 2205 Plymouth Street Midland, MI 48642 / US | 07 /
BRUZA, Kenneth, J. 5651 North Luce Road Alma, MI 48801 / US | 08 /
BOUCK, Kevin, J. 3760 East Acacia Drive Midland, MI 48642 / US | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Raynor, John, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | Raynor, John, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03742714.3 | 07.02.2003 | [2004/47] | WO2003US03826 | Priority number, date | US20020077646 | 15.02.2002 Original published format: US 77646 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03070813 | Date: | 28.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1476500 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/00, C08J9/26, C08L25/00, C08L61/00, C08G83/00, C08L101/00, C08G61/02, C08K7/16, C08L51/04, C08J9/18, C08L25/06, H01B3/46, H01L23/00, H01L23/532, H01L21/312, H01L21/768 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
C08J9/28 (EP,KR,US);
C08F257/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F283/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08G61/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02118 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02203 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02282 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/31695 (US);
H01L23/5329 (EP,KR,US);
C08G2261/312 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2351/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/312 (US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/47] | C08J9/00, C08J9/26, C08L25/00, C08L61/00, C08G83/00, C08L101/00, C08G61/02, C08K7/16, C08L51/04, C08J9/18, C08L25/06, H01B3/46, H01L23/00, H01L21/332, H01L21/312 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES NANOPORÖSEN FILMS | [2004/47] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING A NANOPOROUS FILM | [2004/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN FILM NANOPOREUX | [2004/47] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 07.11.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US5700844 (HEDRICK JEFFREY CURTIS [US], et al) [XD] 1-5,9,10,13* column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 48 *; | [X]WO0031183 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-13 * page 1, line 6 - page 16, line 23; examples 3,5,7,9; claims 6-13,18-23,28 *; | [X]WO0138417 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-13 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 6 * * page 5, line 10 - page 11, line 6; example 18; claims 1-15 * | International search | [X]WO0138417 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-13 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 6 * * page 5, line 10 - page 11, line 6; example 18; claims 1-15 *; | [X]WO0031183 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-13 * page 1, line 6 - page 16, line 23; examples 3,5,7,9; claims 6-13,18-23,28 *; | [XD]US5700844 (HEDRICK JEFFREY CURTIS [US], et al) [XD] 1-5,9,10,13 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 48 * |