EP1478901 - DEVICE FOR THE CONTACTLESS MEASUREMENT OF A DISTANCE IN RELATION TO A SURFACE LOCATED IN A NARROW GAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNSER, Roland Rastatter Strasse 73a 76199 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
HARTRUMPF, Matthias Hertzstrasse 164b 76187 Karlsruhe / DE | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Rösler, Uwe Rösler Patentanwaltskanzlei Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Rösler, Uwe, Dipl.-Phys. Rösler Patentanwaltskanzlei, Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03742965.1 | 27.02.2003 | [2004/48] | WO2003EP02037 | Priority number, date | DE20021008377 | 27.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10208377 | [2004/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03073043 | Date: | 04.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1478901 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1478901 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/14 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
G01B11/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BERÜHRUNGSLOSEN ABSTANDSMESSUNG ZU EINER IN EINEM ENGSPALT BEFINDLICHEN FLÄCHE | [2004/48] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE CONTACTLESS MEASUREMENT OF A DISTANCE IN RELATION TO A SURFACE LOCATED IN A NARROW GAP | [2004/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR MESURER SANS CONTACT UNE DISTANCE PAR RAPPORT A UNE SURFACE SE TROUVANT DANS UNE FENTE ETROITE | [2004/48] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 29.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2003 | CY | 27.04.2011 | CZ | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | EE | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | IE | 27.04.2011 | IT | 27.04.2011 | NL | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | SI | 27.04.2011 | SK | 27.04.2011 | TR | 27.04.2011 | BG | 27.07.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | ES | 07.08.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
TR | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 29.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]EP0330429 (CANADIAN PATENTS DEV [CA]) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,15 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 8 * * claims 1,7 * * figures 2,7 * [A] 3,4,8,10 [Y] 11-14; | [YDA]EP0589066 (INPRO INNOVATIONS GMBH [DE]) [YD] 11-14 * column 4, line 9 - line 22 * * figure 2 * [A] 4,8; | [DA]US6043891 (HARTRUMPF MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [DA] 1-15* the whole document * |