EP1482507 - Flag to indicate in a TV program list if both time and location information are simultaneously present in the data to be recorded on a HDD. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/49] | INFORMATION RECORDING DEVICE, INFORMATION REPRODUCTION DEVICE, INFORMATION RECORDING METHOD, INFORMATION REPRODUCTION METHOD, INFORMATION RECORDING PROGRAM, INFORMATION REPRODUCTION PROGRAM, AND INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM | ||
[2009/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-8677 / JP | For all designated states SHARP CORPORATION 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 3-12, Moriyacho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-8528 / JP | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-8677 / JP | ||
For all designated states SHARP CORPORATION 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | |||
For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 3-12, Moriyacho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-8528 / JP | |||
For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | |||
For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | |||
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-8677 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sharp Corporation 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | |||
For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 3-12, Moriyacho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-8528 / JP | |||
For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | |||
For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANAI, Yuichi, c/o Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 02 /
HORI, Yoshihiro, c/o Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 03 /
OHNO, Ryoji, c/o Sharp Corporation 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 04 /
OHISHI, Takeo, c/o Victor Company of Japan Limited 12, Moriya-cho 3-chome, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-8528 / JP | 05 /
TADA, Kenichiro, c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works, 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359-0047 / JP | 06 /
TOZAKI, Akihiro, c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works, 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359-0047 / JP | 07 /
HIRAI, Tatsuya, c/o Systems Development Laboratory Hitachi, Ltd., 1099, Ouzenji, Asao-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 215-0013 / JP | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03743602.9 | 04.03.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003JP02508 | Priority number, date | JP20020107157 | 05.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002107157 | [2004/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03075275 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1482507 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1482507 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/28, G11B20/12, H04N5/76, H04N5/92 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G11B20/0021 (EP,US);
G11B20/00507 (EP,US);
G11B20/00847 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (KR);
H04N5/91 (KR);
H04N5/92 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2004/49] | G11B27/00, G11B20/12, H04N5/76, H04N5/91, H04N5/92 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/27] |
Former [2004/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flag in einer TV Programliste, welches anzeigt, ob beide Informationen über Zeit und Ort in den auf einen HDD aufzunehmenden Daten gleichzeitig vorhanden sind. | [2009/08] | English: | Flag to indicate in a TV program list if both time and location information are simultaneously present in the data to be recorded on a HDD. | [2009/08] | French: | Drapeau indiquant dans une liste de programmes TV si les informations de temps et de position sont simultanement présentes dans les données à enregistrer dans un HDD. | [2009/08] |
Former [2004/49] | INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSEINRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSWIEDERGABEEINRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN, INFORMATIONSWIEDERGABEVERFAHREN, INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSPROGRAMM, INFORMATIONSWIEDERGABEPROGRAMM UND INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | ||
Former [2004/49] | INFORMATION RECORDING DEVICE, INFORMATION REPRODUCTION DEVICE, INFORMATION RECORDING METHOD, INFORMATION REPRODUCTION METHOD, INFORMATION RECORDING PROGRAM, INFORMATION REPRODUCTION PROGRAM, AND INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM | ||
Former [2004/49] | DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS, DISPOSITIF DE REPRODUCTION D'INFORMATIONS, PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCEDE DE REPRODUCTION D'INFORMATIONS, PROGRAMME D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROGRAMME DE REPRODUCTION D'INFORMATIONS, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2004 | Translation filed | 26.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 12.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000215651 ; | [X]US2001010754 (ANDO HIDEO [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract *; | [X]US2001048804 (YOO JEA-YONG [KR], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045]; figure 3; claim 1 *; | [X] - CHOU P. A.,GARDOS T., "The MPEG-4 Intermediate Format as an extension of ASF", ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 M2969, San Jose, vol. MPEG98, no. M2969, pages 1 - 39, URL: http://pddocserv/specdocs/data/standards/MPEG/1998/1998-02_SanJose/Contributions/m2969.doc, XP002381597 [X] 1-14 * page 32, line 5 - line 9 * * page 35, line 10 - line 25 * * page 11, line 16 - line 22 * * page 8, line 31 - line 33 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, & JP2000215651 A 20000804 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [X] 1-14 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2000215651 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); | [Y]WO0049803 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2000333128 (SONY CORP); | [AP]JP2002218398 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |