EP1480560 - X-RAY PROTECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sectra Mamea AB Smidesvägen 5 171 41 Solna / SE | [2008/43] |
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states Sectra Mamea AB Osquldas väg 6 114 28 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Mamea Imaging AB Osquldas Väg 6 114 28 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANIELSSON, Mats Rösvägen 12 S-187 43 Täby / SE | 02 /
HJÄRN, Torbjörn Överby 5 S-185 94 Vaxholm / SE | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Gothenburg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Gothenburg / SE | ||
Former [2004/49] | Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB, Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 03743657.3 | 03.03.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003SE00365 | Priority number, date | SE20020000654 | 01.03.2002 Original published format: SE 0200654 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03073939 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1480560 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1480560 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/10 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
A61B6/502 (EP,US);
A61B6/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÖNTGENSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG | [2004/49] | English: | X-RAY PROTECTION DEVICE | [2004/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES RAYONS X | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 23.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 08.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.05.2010 | BE | 05.05.2010 | CY | 05.05.2010 | CZ | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | EE | 05.05.2010 | HU | 05.05.2010 | NL | 05.05.2010 | RO | 05.05.2010 | SE | 05.05.2010 | SI | 05.05.2010 | SK | 05.05.2010 | TR | 05.05.2010 | BG | 05.08.2010 | GR | 06.08.2010 | ES | 16.08.2010 | PT | 06.09.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
TR | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
BG | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 05.05.2010 | |
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 05.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4090084 (EPSTEIN HEYWOOD Y, et al); | [X]US4122350 (LIPTHAY JULIUS, et al); | [A]US4825455 (BAUER MANFRED [DE]); | [A]US4943991 (MOSBY RICHARD A [US]); | [A]US6325538 (HEESCH CHRISTIAN M [US]) |