EP1490268 - RECLOSABLE FASTENER FOR A BAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/01] | RECLOSABLE FASTENERS OR ZIPPERS FOR USE WITH POLYMERIC BAGS | ||
[2010/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pactiv Corporation 1900 West Field Court Lake Forest, IL 60045 / US | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOBRESKI, David, V. 99 Country Downs Circle Fairport, NY 14450 / US | 02 /
FERRARI, Daniel, B. 73 Orchard Drive Rochester, NY 14618 / US | 03 /
LONG, Steven, P. 6468 Vincent Hill Road Canandaigua, NY 14424 / US | 04 /
BLYTHE, James, S. 22 Nunda Boulevard Rochester, NY 14610 / US | 05 /
CAMERON, David, P. 4158 Middle Cheshire Road Canandaigua, NY 14424 / US | [2010/10] |
Former [2005/12] | 01 /
DOBRESKI, David, V. 99 Country Downs Circle Fairport, NY 14450 / US | ||
02 /
FERRARI, Daniel, B. 73 Orchard Drive Rochester, NY 14618 / US | |||
03 /
LONG, Steven, P. 6468 Vincent Hill Road Canandaigua, NY 14424 / US | |||
04 /
THOMAS, Toby, R. 5411 88th Street , Pleasant Prairie Wisconsin, 53158 / US | |||
05 /
BLYTHE, James, S. 22 Nunda Boulevard Rochester, NY 14610 / US | |||
06 /
CAMERON, David, P. 4158 Middle Cheshire Road Canandaigua, NY 14424 / US | |||
Former [2005/01] | 01 /
DOBRESKI, David, V. 99 Country Downs Circle Fairport, NY 14450 / US | ||
02 /
FERRARI, Daniel, B. 73 Orchard Drive Rochester, NY 14618 / US | |||
03 /
LONG, Steven, P. 6468 Vincent Hill Road Canandaigua, NY 14424 / US | |||
04 /
THOMAS, Toby, R. 7644 Hillside Victor, NY 14564 / US | |||
05 /
BLYTHE, James, S. 22 Nunda Boulevard Rochester, NY 14610 / US | |||
06 /
CAMERON, David, P. 4158 Middle Cheshire Road Canandaigua, NY 14424 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03743714.2 | 26.02.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003US06050 | Priority number, date | US20020361171P | 01.03.2002 Original published format: US 361171 P | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03074371 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1490268 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1490268 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D33/25, A44B19/26 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
B65D33/25865 (EP,US);
B65D33/2541 (EP,US);
A44B19/267 (EP,US);
Y10T24/15 (EP,US);
Y10T24/158 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2532 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | B65D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBARE BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT FÜR EINEN BEUTEL | [2010/05] | English: | RECLOSABLE FASTENER FOR A BAG | [2010/05] | French: | SYSTEME DE FERMETURE REFERMABLE POUR UN SACHET | [2010/05] |
Former [2005/01] | WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBARE BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENTE ODER REISSVERSCHLÜSSE ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT POLYMERBEUTELN | ||
Former [2005/01] | RECLOSABLE FASTENERS OR ZIPPERS FOR USE WITH POLYMERIC BAGS | ||
Former [2005/01] | SYSTEMES DE FERMETURE PAR PRESSION OU GLISSIERE REUTILISABLES POUR SACHETS POLYMERIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 12.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10004000.5 / EP2241512 | EP10013421.2 / EP2292522 | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.11.2010 | BE | 10.11.2010 | CY | 10.11.2010 | CZ | 10.11.2010 | DK | 10.11.2010 | EE | 10.11.2010 | FI | 10.11.2010 | HU | 10.11.2010 | NL | 10.11.2010 | SE | 10.11.2010 | SI | 10.11.2010 | SK | 10.11.2010 | TR | 10.11.2010 | BG | 10.02.2011 | GR | 11.02.2011 | IE | 26.02.2011 | LU | 26.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | PT | 10.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
TR | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IE | 26.02.2011 | ||
LU | 26.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IE | 26.02.2011 | ||
LU | 26.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IE | 26.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5664299 (PORCHIA JOSE [US], et al) [A] 1-4,7,8,11* column 3, paragraph 2 - column 5, paragraph 3; figures 2-5 * | International search | [X]US4947525 (VAN ERDEN DONALD L [US]); | [X]USRE34554E (AUSNIT STEVEN [US]); | [X]US5293672 (TOMINAGA YUTAKA [JP], et al); | [X]US5442837 (MORGAN KEVIN P [US]); | [X]US5689866 (KASAI JUICHI [JP], et al); | [X]US5983466 (PETKOVSEK GREGORY L [US]); | [X]US6009603 (GALLAGHER STEPHEN F [US]); | [X]US6299353 (PIECHOCKI DUANE B [US], et al); | [T]US6527444 (BUCHMAN JAMES E [US]); | [T]US2003077009 (SCHREITER MICHAEL E [US]) |