EP1483864 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING DATA DURING AN AUDIO CONFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polycom, Inc. 6001 America Center Drive San Jose, CA 95002 / US | [2013/34] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Polycom, Inc. 4750 Willow Road Pleasanton, California 94588-2708 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODMAN, Jeffrey Polycom, Inc. 1565 Barber Lane Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 02 /
DRELL, David Polycom, Inc. 1565 Barber Lane Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Käck, Stefan, et al Kahler Käck Mollekopf Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Käck, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03743750.6 | 03.03.2003 | [2004/50] | WO2003US06698 | Priority number, date | US20020360984P | 01.03.2002 Original published format: US 360984 P | US20020335108 | 31.12.2002 Original published format: US 335108 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03075510 | Date: | 12.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1483864 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/16, H04M3/56, H04L27/34, H04M11/06 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
H04M3/56 (EP,US);
H04L12/66 (EP,US);
H04M1/6025 (EP,US);
H04M11/06 (EP,US);
H04M11/066 (EP,US);
H04M3/567 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/50] | H04L12/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERMITTLUNG VON DATEN WÄHREND EINER AUDIOKONFERENZ | [2004/50] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING DATA DURING AN AUDIO CONFERENCE | [2004/50] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION DES DONNEES PENDANT UNE AUDIOCONFERENCE | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 18.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0669749 (MULTI TECH SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-21 * page 2, line 45 - line 55 * * page 3, line 33 - page 8, line L * * page 25, line 23 - page 31, line 11 *; | [A] - MERMELSTEIN P, "G.722, A NEW CCITT CODING STANDARD FOR DIGITAL TRANSMISSION OF WIDEBAND AUDIO SIGNALS", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (198801), vol. 26, no. 1, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 8 - 15, XP001025802 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.417 | International search | [XP]US2002093985 (NIMMAGADDA PRASAD [US]); | [AP]US2002097679 (BERENBAUM ALAN D [US]); | [A]US6088368 (RUBINSTAIN AVINOAM [IL], et al); | [A]US2001033613 (VITENBERG ROMAN [IL]) | by applicant | EP0669749 |