EP1488107 - ECCENTRIC PUMP AND METHOD FOR OPERATION OF SAID PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leybold Vakuum GmbH Bonner Strasse 498 50968 Köln / DE | [2004/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREIFERT, Thomas Falkenweg 5 50171 Kerpen / DE | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Leineweber, Jürgen, et al Patentanwalt Siebachstrasse 47 50733 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | Leineweber, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys., et al Aggerstrasse 24 50859 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 03744779.4 | 18.02.2003 | [2004/52] | WO2003EP01597 | Priority number, date | DE2002112940 | 22.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10212940 | [2004/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03081048 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1488107 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1488107 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/107 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
F04C18/107 (EP,US);
F04C2220/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/48] |
Former [2004/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXZENTERPUMPE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DIESER PUMPE | [2004/52] | English: | ECCENTRIC PUMP AND METHOD FOR OPERATION OF SAID PUMP | [2004/52] | French: | POMPE A EXCENTRIQUE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER LADITE POMPE | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 31.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5542832 (SONE YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1,37 * column 15, line 36 - line 39; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]JPH11351172 ; | [A]JPH10184561 ; | [A]US5062778 (HATTORI HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,37 * figure 1; claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000330), vol. 2000, no. 03, & JP11351172 A 19991221 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,37 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10184561 A 19980714 (IMAI ATSUSHI;IMAI TORU; IMAI HIROSHI; IMAI YUTAKA; OCHI MASAFUMI) [A] 1,37 * abstract * |