EP1487301 - SELF-CLOSING DRAWER RUNNERS WITH INTEGRATED DAMPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALFIT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Sennemahd 10 6840 Götzis / AT | [2004/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGER, Horst Engadinstrasse 2 33729 Bielefeld / DE | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Helber, Friedrich Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner Patentanwälte Scheuergasse 24 64673 Zwingenberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/52] | Helber, Friedrich G., Dipl.-Ing. Zenz, Helber & Hosbach Patentanwälte Scheuergasse 24 64673 Zwingenberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03744829.7 | 21.03.2003 | [2004/52] | WO2003EP02960 | Priority number, date | DE2002204860U | 26.03.2002 Original published format: DE 20204860 U | [2004/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03079855 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1487301 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1487301 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/04 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
A47B88/467 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0094 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/48] |
Former [2004/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SCHUBLADEN-AUSZIEHFÜHRUNGEN MIT EINZUGSAUTOMATIK MIT INTEGRIERTER DÄMPFUNG | [2004/52] | English: | SELF-CLOSING DRAWER RUNNERS WITH INTEGRATED DAMPING | [2004/52] | French: | COULISSES TELESCOPIQUES DE TIROIR A FERMETURE AUTOMATIQUE ET AMORTISSEMENT INTEGRE | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 15.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/40] | IT | 30.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3539240 (DELORENZO PAUL) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [A]DE4328502 (FULTERER GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US5364179 (BRUESTLE KLAUS [AT], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]EP1188397 (SALICE ARTURO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4020277 |