EP1492598 - SKI BINDING, IN PARTICULAR FOR CROSS-COUNTRY SKIING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fischer Gesellschaft m.b.H. Fischerstrasse 8 4910 Ried im Innkreis / AT | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOGLER, Hannes Reschauerstrasse 24/4 A-4840 Vöcklabruck / AT | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 03745686.0 | 04.04.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003AT00100 | Priority number, date | AT20020000560 | 11.04.2002 Original published format: AT 5602002 | [2005/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03084620 | Date: | 16.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1492598 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1492598 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/35] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1492598 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A63C9/20 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A63C9/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE [2005/38] |
Former [2005/35] | AT, BE | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SKIBINDUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR DEN LANGLAUF | [2005/01] | English: | SKI BINDING, IN PARTICULAR FOR CROSS-COUNTRY SKIING | [2005/01] | French: | FIXATION DE SKI, NOTAMMENT DE SKI DE FOND | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 09.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2706111 (FROER WERNER) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE3141425 (BECK HEINZ, et al) [A] 1* figures 4,5 *; | [A]WO8400498 (FENZL HUBERT, et al) [A] 1-10 * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 30; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO9734667 (SCHNITZHOFER JOSEF PETER [AT]) [A] 1 * figure 7 *; | [PX]WO02087710 (FISCHER GMBH [AT], et al) [PX] 1-10 * page 7, line 31 - page 9, line 10; figures 10-17 * | by applicant | DE2706111 |