EP1492754 - METHOD FOR MAKING CARBOXYLIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODIA POLYAMIDE INTERMEDIATES Avenue Ramboz 69190 Saint-Fons / FR | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONNET, Didier 45, Boulevard des Canuts F-69004 LYON / FR | 02 /
FACHE, Eric 33 A, chemin des Petites Brosses F-69300 CALUIRE / FR | 03 /
SIMONATO, Jean-Pierre 43 Lotissement du Néron F-38360 SASSENAGE / FR | 04 /
VERACINI, Serge 36, avenue de Ménival F-69005 LYON / FR | [2005/13] |
Former [2005/01] | 01 /
BONNET, Didier 45, Boulevard des Canuts F-69004 LYON / FR | ||
02 /
FACHE, Eric 33 A, chemin des Petites Brosses F-69300 CALUIRE / FR | |||
03 /
SIMONATO, Jean-Pierre 7, rue François Gérin F-38360 SASSENAGE / FR | |||
04 /
VERACINI, Serge 36, avenue de Ménival F-69005 LYON / FR | Representative(s) | Esson, Jean-Pierre Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle CRIT-Carrières B.P. 62 69192 Saint-Fons Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Esson, Jean-Pierre Rhodia Services, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, Crit-Carrières, B.P. 62 69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03745809.8 | 28.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003FR00984 | Priority number, date | FR20020004332 | 08.04.2002 Original published format: FR 0204332 | [2005/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03084913 | Date: | 16.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1492754 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1492754 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/23, C07C55/14, C07C53/00, C07C55/21, C07C57/30 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
C07C51/23 (EP,KR);
C07C55/14 (KR);
C07C55/21 (KR);
C07C57/30 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/23, C07C53/00 (EP);
C07C51/23, C07C55/14 (EP);
C07C51/23, C07C55/21 (EP);
C07C51/23, C07C57/30 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CARBONSÄUREN | [2005/01] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING CARBOXYLIC ACIDS | [2005/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'ACIDES CARBOXYLIQUES | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 25.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.11.2008 | CY | 05.11.2008 | CZ | 05.11.2008 | DK | 05.11.2008 | EE | 05.11.2008 | FI | 05.11.2008 | IE | 05.11.2008 | NL | 05.11.2008 | RO | 05.11.2008 | SI | 05.11.2008 | SK | 05.11.2008 | BG | 05.02.2009 | SE | 05.02.2009 | GR | 06.02.2009 | LU | 28.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | PT | 06.04.2009 | HU | 06.05.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
LU | 28.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
HU | 06.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
LU | 28.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
GR | 06.02.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
SE | 05.02.2009 | ||
PT | 06.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
BG | 05.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 05.11.2008 | |
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
NL | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 05.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS52931B ; | [A]US3726917 (BRUNIE J, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0519569 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5321157 (KOLLAR JOHN [US]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0784045 (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE19941315 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, lines 57-64 * * column 2, lines 33-60 * * column 3, lines 1-6 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1977, no. 05, Database accession no. 1977-08696Y, XP002217021 & JPS52931B B1 19770111 (TEIJIN LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |