EP1492511 - ORAL PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION IN THE FORM OF AQUEOUS SUSPENSION FOR MODIFIED RELEASE OF ACTIVE PRINCIPLE(S) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been limited Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLAMEL TECHNOLOGIES 33, avenue du Docteur Georges Lévy 69200 Vénissieux / FR | [2009/02] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Flamel Technologies 33, avenue du Docteur Georges Lévy 69200 Vénissieux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASTAN, Catherine "Le Verger du Gontey" 55, chemin du May F-69530 Olienas / FR | 02 /
GUIMBERTEAU, Florence 3, route de la Garenne F-33450 Montussan / FR | 03 /
MEYRUEIX, Rémi 42, rue Hector Berlioz "Le Bois St Rambert" F-69009 Lyon / FR | [2012/18] |
Former [2005/01] | 01 /
CASTAN, Catherine "Le Verger du Gontey", 55, chemin du May F-69530 Olienas / FR | ||
02 /
GUIMBERTEAU, Florence 3, route de la Garenne F-33450 Montussan / FR | |||
03 /
MEYRUEIX, Rémi 42, rue Hector Berlioz, "Le Bois St Rambert" F-69009 Lyon / FR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | Fleurance, Raphaël, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 235 cours Lafayette 69006 Lyon / FR | ||
Former [2005/01] | Fleurance, Raphael, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03745832.0 | 07.04.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003FR01096 | Priority number, date | FR20020004409 | 09.04.2002 Original published format: FR 0204409 | FR20020010847 | 02.09.2002 Original published format: FR 0210847 | [2005/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03084518 | Date: | 16.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1492511 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1492511 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/02] | Type: | B3 Limited patent | No.: | EP1492511 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/50 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A61K9/5047 (EP,US);
A61K9/50 (KR);
A61K31/155 (EP,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K31/43 (EP,US);
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61K31/585 (EP,US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61K9/0095 (EP,US);
A61K9/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/5015 (EP,US);
A61K9/5026 (EP,US);
A61K9/5042 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | ORALE WÄSSRIGE SUSPENSION, MIKROKAPSELN ENTHALTEND, ZUR KONTROLLIERTEN FREISETZUNG VON WIRKSTOFFEN | [2008/29] | English: | ORAL PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION IN THE FORM OF AQUEOUS SUSPENSION FOR MODIFIED RELEASE OF ACTIVE PRINCIPLE(S) | [2005/01] | French: | FORMULATION PHARMACEUTIQUE ORALE SOUS FORME DE SUSPENSION AQUEUSE DE MICROCAPSULES PERMETTANT LA LIBERATION MODIFIEE DE PRINCIPE(S) ACTIF(S) | [2005/01] |
Former [2005/01] | ORALE SUSPENSION VON MIKROKAPSELN ENTHALTEND WIRKSTOFFE | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 18.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] | Limitations: | 03.03.2011 | Date of receipt of request for limitation | admissible | 24.10.2011 | Communication of intention to limit the patent | 03.01.2012 | Fee for printing patent specification after limitation | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.01.2009 | CZ | 07.01.2009 | DK | 07.01.2009 | EE | 07.01.2009 | FI | 07.01.2009 | RO | 07.01.2009 | SI | 07.01.2009 | SK | 07.01.2009 | BG | 07.04.2009 | GR | 08.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | HU | 08.07.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
HU | 08.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | DK | 07.01.2009 | |
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | FI | 07.01.2009 | |
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | SI | 07.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3943242 (POLI IND CHIMICA SPA [IT]) [X] 1-20 * claims 1-4,8,10 * * page 4, line 35 - line 43 * * page 7, line 65 - page 8, line 7 *; | [X]EP0475536 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1-20 * claims 1-3,5-7 * * page 5; example 4 *; | [X]EP0624371 (FLAMEL TECH SA [FR]) [X] 1-20 * claims 1,7-10 * * page 7, line 13 - line 17 * * page 7; example 1.1 *; | [X]EP1123700 (EURAND AMERICA INC [US]) [X] 1-20* claims 1,6,8-11 * |