EP1494229 - INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM AND ITS PRODUCTION METHOD, AND OPTICAL INFORMATION RECORDING/REPRODUCING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIONO, Teruhiro 2-50, Nagayoshi-rokutan 4-chome, Hirano-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 547-0012 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Hiroaki 98-8, Shirogane 1-chome Inagawa-cho, Kawabe-gun, Hyogo 666-0257 / JP | 03 /
NISHINO, Seiji 11-15, Kitabatake 2-chome, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-0035 / JP | 04 /
MITSUYU, Tsuneo 4-1-1-312, Nishimakino Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1148 / JP | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Schorr, Frank, Dr., et al Diehl Glaeser Hiltl & Partner, Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03745934.4 | 07.04.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003JP04378 | Priority number, date | JP20020104829 | 08.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002104829 | [2005/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03085657 | Date: | 16.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494229 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/26, G11B7/004, G11B7/0045, G11B7/005 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
G11B7/243 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
G11B7/00455 (EP,US);
G11B7/24038 (EP,US);
G11B7/251 (EP,US);
G11B7/257 (EP,US);
G11B7/266 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24304 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24306 (EP,US);
G11B2007/2431 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24312 (EP,US);
G11B2007/2432 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24324 (EP,US);
G11B7/2533 (EP,US);
G11B7/2534 (EP,US);
G11B7/2538 (EP,US);
G11B7/2542 (EP,US);
G11B7/258 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFZEICHNEN/WIEDERGEBEN OPTISCHER INFORMATIONEN | [2005/01] | English: | INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM AND ITS PRODUCTION METHOD, AND OPTICAL INFORMATION RECORDING/REPRODUCING APPARATUS | [2005/01] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATION ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION, ET APPAREIL D'ENREGISTREMENT/REPRODUCTION D'INFORMATION OPTIQUE | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2004 | Translation filed | 11.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 03.06.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5559784 (OTA TAKESHI [JP]) [A] 23-31* column 4, line 17 - column 18, line 27; figures 1-28 *; | [X]US2001043495 (KUMACHEVA EUGENIA [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,18-20,23-28,31 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS6228941 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH0462090 (UBE INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH06333259 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]JPH0885259 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]JPH08220688 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11232706 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP, et al); | [X]JP2000036133 (TOSHIBA CORP) |