EP1493955 - MULTI-LAYER TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsuboshi Corporation Limited 3-16, 5-chome Uehonmachi, Tennoji-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 543-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Mitsuboshi Corporation Limited 3-16, 5-chome Uehonmachi, Tennoji-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 543-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Kouji 676, Kawaharajo Habikino-shi, Osaka 583-0867 / JP | 02 /
KITAGAWA, Akinao 676, Kawaharajo Habikino-shi, Osaka 583-0867 / JP | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Bailey, David Martin Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Bailey, David Martin Brookes Batchellor, 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03745990.6 | 09.04.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003JP04534 | Priority number, date | JP20020107135 | 09.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002107135 | [2005/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03085309 | Date: | 16.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1493955 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16L11/04, B32B1/08, B32B25/04, C08L27/12 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
B32B1/08 (EP,KR,US);
F16L11/04 (EP,KR,US);
B32B25/04 (EP,US);
B32B25/08 (US);
B32B25/14 (EP,US);
B32B27/304 (US);
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | F16L11/04, B32B1/08, B32B25/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRLAGIGES ROHR | [2005/01] | English: | MULTI-LAYER TUBE | [2005/01] | French: | TUBE MULTICOUCHE | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2004 | Translation filed | 19.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/11] | 29.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001193659 ; | [A]JPH02300589 ; | [A]JPH02300589 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]EP0582302 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1-3,8 *; | [A]WO9747683 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [A] 2,3 * examples 1,2; claims 1-5 *; | [X]JP2001193659 (MITSUBOSHI CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-7,9 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0013] , [0015] - [0018] - [31 40]; claims 1,2 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 62, Database accession no. 2001-552762, XP002510520 & JP2001193659 A 20010717 (MITSUBOSHI KK) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 05, Database accession no. 1991-032174, XP002510521 & JPH02300589 A 19901212 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2001193659 (MITSUBOSHI CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0236365B ; | [Y]WO0165161 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP], et al); | [A]JPH0966570 (NIHON VALQUA KOGYO KK) |