EP1499729 - DERIVATIVES OF THE NF-KAPPAB INDUCING ENZYME, THEIR PREPARATION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YEDA RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT CO., LTD. The Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 76100 Rehovot / IL | [2007/44] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states YEDA RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMEMT CO., LTD. The Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 76100 Rehovot / IL | ||
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states Yeda Research and Development Co. Ltd. Weizmann Institute of Science, P.O. Box 95 76100 Rehovot / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLACH, David 24 Borochov Street 76406 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
RAMAKRISHNAN, Parameswaran Hanasi Harishon 13/7 76302 Rehovot / IL | 03 /
SHMUSHKOVICH, Taisia 23B Hanassi Harishon Street 76302 Rehovot / IL | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/04] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03746399.9 | 15.04.2003 | [2005/04] | WO2003IL00317 | Priority number, date | IL20020149217 | 18.04.2002 Original published format: IL 14921702 | IL20020152183 | 08.10.2002 Original published format: IL 15218302 | [2005/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03087380 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1499729 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1499729 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1499729 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/54, C12N15/09, C12N15/11, C12N15/63, C12N9/10, C07K16/40, C12N5/10, A61K31/711, A61K31/713, A61K38/45, A61K39/395 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
C12N9/1205 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K14/7155 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/04] | Extension states | AL | 18.11.2004 | LT | 18.11.2004 | LV | 18.11.2004 | MK | 18.11.2004 | Title | German: | DERIVATE EINES NF-KAPPAB INDUZIERENDEN ENZYMS, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER DERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2005/04] | English: | DERIVATIVES OF THE NF-KAPPAB INDUCING ENZYME, THEIR PREPARATION AND USE | [2005/04] | French: | DERIVES DE L'ENZYME INDUCTRICE DU FACTEUR NUCLEAIRE KAPPAB, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2005/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 06.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0578932 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-6,8-18,20-28,30-32,34-39,41-49,51,52,54-70,72-74* the whole document *; | WO9737016 [ ] (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al) [ ] * figure 6 *; | US5854003 [ ] (ROTHE MIKE [US], et al) [ ] * column 13 - column 20; claim 6 *; | [X] - ROTHE M, & WU L,, "Human NIK protein.", GENESEQ, EBI, Hinxton, Cambridgeshire, U.K., (19990304), Database accession no. AAW82497, XP002249620 [X] 42-49,51,52,54,55 * abstract * | [X] - BOLDIN M ET AL.,, "Amino acid sequence of NF-kappaB inducing kinase.", GENESEQ, EBI, Hinxton, Cambridgeshire, U.K., (19980415), Database accession no. AAW42402, XP002249621 [X] 42-49,51,52,54,55 * abstract * | [X] - MALININ NIKOLAI L ET AL, "MAP3K-related kinase involved in NF-kappa-B induction by TNF, CD95 and IL-1.", NATURE (LONDON), (1997), vol. 385, no. 6616, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 540 - 544, XP002036441 [X] 42-49 * page 540 - page 544 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/385540a0 | by applicant | - GRANTHAM, SCIENCE, (1974), vol. 185, pages 862 - 864 | - "Principles That Govern The Folding of Protein Chains", SCIENCE, (1973), vol. 181, pages 223 - 230 | - MENDEZ ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1997), vol. 15, pages 146 - 156 | - BUGGEMANN ET AL., EUR.J. HNMUNOL., (1991), vol. 21, pages 1323 - 1326 | - TOMIZUKA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 722 - 727 |