EP1497287 - Quinoline derivatives in combination with 5-FU or CPT-11 for use in the treatment of cancer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/03] | QUINOLINONE DERIVATIVES | ||
[2010/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states CHIRON CORPORATION 4560 Horton Street Emeryville California 94608-2916 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENHOWE, Paul A. 262 Stetson Drive Danville, CA 94506 / US | 02 /
PECCHI, Sabina 5834 Merriewood Drive Oakland, CA 94506 / US | 03 /
MACHAJEWSKI, Timothy D. 2514 Norwalk Court Martinez, CA 94553 / US | 04 /
SHAFER, Cynthia M. 4868 El Grande Place El Sobrante, CA 94803 / US | 05 /
TAYLOR, Clarke 612 Adams Street Albany, CA 94706 / US | 06 /
McCREA, William R. 1040 Amito Drive Berkeley, CA 94705 / US | 07 /
McBRIDE, Christopher 4504 Lawton Avenue Oakland, CA 94609 / US | 08 /
JAZAN, Elisa 520 McLaughlin Avenue Richmond, CA 94805 / US | 09 /
HEISE, Carla 436 Hawthorne Lane Benicia, CA 94510 / US | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03746614.1 | 04.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003US10463 | Priority number, date | US20020116117 | 05.04.2002 Original published format: US 116117 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03087095 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1497287 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1497287 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/47, A61K31/4166, A61K31/4745, A61K45/06, A61P35/00 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/4704 (KR);
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K31/439 (EP,US);
A61K31/47 (EP,US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K31/541 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D409/04 (EP,US);
C07D413/04 (EP,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/19, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/03] | C07D417/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Chinolinonderivate in Kombination mit 5-FU oder CPT-11 für die Verwendung in der Behandlung von Krebs | [2010/14] | English: | Quinoline derivatives in combination with 5-FU or CPT-11 for use in the treatment of cancer | [2010/14] | French: | Dérivés de quinoline en combinaison avec 5-FU ou CPT-11 pour leur utilisation dans le traitement du cancer | [2010/14] |
Former [2005/03] | CHINOLINONDERIVATE | ||
Former [2005/03] | QUINOLINONE DERIVATIVES | ||
Former [2005/03] | DERIVES DE QUINOLINONE | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 07.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.11.2010 | CZ | 24.11.2010 | DK | 24.11.2010 | EE | 24.11.2010 | FI | 24.11.2010 | HU | 24.11.2010 | RO | 24.11.2010 | SE | 24.11.2010 | SI | 24.11.2010 | SK | 24.11.2010 | BG | 24.02.2011 | IE | 04.04.2011 | LU | 04.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
IE | 04.04.2011 | ||
LU | 04.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
IE | 04.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0071129 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [Y] 1-17* page 12 *; | [Y]WO0222598 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * page 5 - page 11 * * page 95 * * page 106 - page 149 * | International search | [X]WO0128993 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [XP]US2002103230 (RENHOWE PAUL A [US], et al); | [XP]US2002107392 (RENHOWE PAUL A [US], et al); | [XP]US2003028018 (RENHOWE PAUL A [US], et al) |