EP1497409 - GROWTH MEDIUM FOR MICROORGANISMS COMPRISING THE BIOMASS OF METHANOTROPHIC AND HETEROTROPHIC BACTERIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/03] | GROWTH MEDIUM FOR MICROORGANISMS COMPRISING THE BIOMASS OF METHANOTROPHIC BACTERIA | ||
[2005/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Statoil ASA 4035 Stavanger / NO | [2007/14] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Norferm DA P.O. Box 8005 4068 Stavanger / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOEN, Einar, c/o Norferm DA Postboks 8005 N-4068 Stavanger / NO | 02 /
JORGENSEN, Jeanette M., c/o Norferm Danmark A/S Postboks 829 DK-5230 Odense / DK | 03 /
JENSEN, Karen M., c/o Norferm Danmark A/S Postboks 829 DK-5230 Odense / DK | 04 /
JOHANNESSEN, Arild, c/o Norferm DA Postboks 8005 N-4068 Stavanger / NO | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Golding, Louise Ann Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Golding, Louise Ann Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03746864.2 | 17.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003GB01689 | Priority number, date | GB20020009007 | 19.04.2002 Original published format: GB 0209007 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03089625 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1497409 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1497409 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
C12N1/20 (EP,KR,US);
C12N1/00 (KR);
C12N1/12 (EP);
C12N9/2471 (EP);
C12P13/08 (EP,US);
C12P7/6434 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WACHSTUMSMEDIUM FÜR MIKROORGANISMEN UMFASSEND DIE BIOMASSE VON METHANOTROPHEN UND HETEROTROPHEN BAKTERIEN | [2005/40] | English: | GROWTH MEDIUM FOR MICROORGANISMS COMPRISING THE BIOMASS OF METHANOTROPHIC AND HETEROTROPHIC BACTERIA | [2005/40] | French: | MILIEU DE CROISSANCE POUR LES MICROORGANISMES COMPRENANT LA BIOMASSE DE BACTERIES METHANOTROPHIQUES ET HETEROTROPHIQUES | [2005/40] |
Former [2005/03] | WACHSTUMSMEDIUM FÜR MIKROORGANISMEN UMFASSEND DIE BIOMASSE VON METHANOTROPHEN BAKTERIEN | ||
Former [2005/03] | GROWTH MEDIUM FOR MICROORGANISMS COMPRISING THE BIOMASS OF METHANOTROPHIC BACTERIA | ||
Former [2005/03] | MILIEU DE CROISSANCE POUR LES MICROORGANISMES COMPRENANT LA BIOMASSE DE BACTERIES METHANOTROPHIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 21.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.05.2006 | EE | 24.05.2006 | FI | 24.05.2006 | RO | 24.05.2006 | SI | 24.05.2006 | TR | 24.05.2006 | BG | 24.08.2006 | GR | 25.08.2006 | ES | 04.09.2006 | PT | 24.10.2006 | HU | 25.11.2006 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | CY | 24.05.2006 | |
EE | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
RO | 24.05.2006 | ||
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
BG | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | EE | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
RO | 24.05.2006 | ||
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
BG | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
RO | 24.05.2006 | ||
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
BG | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
RO | 24.05.2006 | ||
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
RO | 24.05.2006 | ||
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
RO | 24.05.2006 | ||
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
SI | 24.05.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | ES | 04.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]DD290917 (AKAD WISSENSCHAFTEN DDR [DE]) [X] 1-8,10-14 * page 1; claim 1 * * page 2, line 12 *; | [DA]WO0160974 (NORFERM DA [NO], et al) [DA] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A] - BOTHE HARALD ET AL, "Heterotrophic bacteria growing in association with Methylococcus capsulatus (Bath) in a single cell protein production process", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200206), vol. 59, no. 1, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 33 - 39, XP002257531 [A] 1-14 * published online on 4 April 2002 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-002-0964-1 |