EP1497189 - PLASTIC BOTTLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alpla-Werke Alwin Lehner GmbH und Co.KG Allmendstrasse 6971 Hard / AT | [2005/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DORNBACH, Christian Ferdinand-Weiss-Strasse 17 A-6972 Fussach / AT | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Schreiber, Wolfgang, et al Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | [2008/31] |
Former [2005/03] | Schreiber, Wolfgang, et al Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 Postfach 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | Application number, filing date | 03747090.3 | 10.02.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003EP01278 | Priority number, date | CH20020070902 | 25.04.2002 Original published format: CH 709022002 | [2005/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03091117 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1497189 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1497189 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/02 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
B65D1/0284 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUNTSTOFFFLASCHE | [2005/03] | English: | PLASTIC BOTTLE | [2005/03] | French: | BOUTEILLE EN PLASTIQUE | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 14.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.05.2006 | CZ | 17.05.2006 | EE | 17.05.2006 | FI | 17.05.2006 | IE | 17.05.2006 | IT | 17.05.2006 | NL | 17.05.2006 | SI | 17.05.2006 | SK | 17.05.2006 | TR | 17.05.2006 | BG | 17.08.2006 | DK | 17.08.2006 | SE | 17.08.2006 | GR | 18.08.2006 | ES | 28.08.2006 | PT | 17.10.2006 | HU | 18.11.2006 | LU | 10.02.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | CY | 17.05.2006 | |
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
EE | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
LU | 10.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
EE | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 17.08.2006 | |
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 17.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0363114 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD) [A] 1 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]JPH10305824 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) [A] 1* figure 4B *; | [XP]WO02085755 (GRAHAM PACKAGING CO [US]) [XP] 1,3,8 * page 5, line 15 - line 17; figure 1 * |