EP1497566 - BLIND RIVET AND METHOD TO MAKE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2007 [2007/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newfrey LLC 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Newfrey LLC 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Steven Victor 34 Shenstone Road Great Barr, Birmingham B43 5LN / GB | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al haarpatent Patentanwälte Krämer Meyer Goethestraße 2 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Haar, Lucas H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar, Lessingstrasse 3 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03747097.8 | 09.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003EP03651 | Priority number, date | GB20020009143 | 23.04.2002 Original published format: GB 0209143 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03091581 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1497566 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16B19/10, B21K1/60 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
F16B19/1054 (EP,US);
B21K1/60 (EP,US);
B23D21/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLINDNIET UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2005/03] | English: | BLIND RIVET AND METHOD TO MAKE SAME | [2005/03] | French: | RIVET AVEUGLE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE LE FABRIQUER | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 18.01.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 22.02.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 11.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/02] | 25.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0677666 (AVDEL SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [Y] 6 * figure 1 *; | [DY]GB2332722 (EMHART INC [US]) [DY] 1-10 * figures 1,2; claims 1,5,6 *; | [Y]US5183357 (PALM ERICH [CH]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]GB876255 (OLYMPIC SCREW & RIVET CORP) [A] 1-8 * figures 3,6-8 *; | [YA]WO9964751 (TEXTRON FASTENING SYST LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 11-20 * page 1, line 12 - line 23 * * page 6, line 8 - line 14; figures 2,3 * [A] 1,2; | [Y]DE4122158 (HILGELAND GMBH & CO GEB [DE]) [Y] 11-20 * column 2, line 1 - line 57; figure 1 * |