EP1509755 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING CHIRP OF A MACH-ZEHNDER TYPE ELECTRO-OPTICAL MODULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/09] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING CHIRP OF A MACH-ZENDER TYPE ELECTRO-OPTICAL MODULATOR | ||
[2007/19] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Photline Technologies 11, rue des Véroniques 25770 Serre les Sapins / FR | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS- 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Photline Technologies 11, rue des Véroniques 25770 Serre les Sapins / FR | ||
For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORTE, Henri 11 Rue des Véroniques F-25770 SERRE LES SAPINS / FR | 02 /
COURJAL, Nadège 14 Rue Château Muguet F-25720 BEURE / FR | 03 /
MOLLIER, Pascal 25 Chemin de Bicquey F-25000 BESANCON / FR | 04 /
HAUDEN, Jérôme 18B Rue de Velotte F-25000 BESANCON / FR | [2007/22] |
Former [2006/21] | 01 /
PORTE, Henri 11 Rue des Véroniques F-25770 SERRE LES SAPINS / FR | ||
02 /
COURJAL, Nadège 14 Rue château Muguet F-25720 BEURE / FR | |||
03 /
MOLLIER, Pascal 25 Chemin de Bicquey F-25000 BESANCON / FR | |||
04 /
HAUDEN, Jérôme 18B Rue de Velotte F-25000 BESANCON / FR | |||
Former [2005/09] | 01 /
PORTE, Henri 11 Rue des Véroniques F-25770 SERRE LES SAPINS / FR | ||
02 /
COURJAL, Nadège 83 Rue Battant F-25000 BESANCON / FR | |||
03 /
MOLLIER, Pascal 25 Chemin de Bicquey F-25000 BESANCON / FR | |||
04 /
HAUDEN, Jérôme 18B Rue de Velotte F-25000 BESANCON / FR | Representative(s) | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03747468.1 | 28.04.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003FR01332 | Priority number, date | FR20020005393 | 29.04.2002 Original published format: FR 0205393 | [2005/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03093777 | Date: | 13.11.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1509755 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01J9/00, G01M11/00, G02F1/225 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
G01J9/00 (EP);
G02F1/225 (EP);
G02F2203/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES CHIRPENS EINES ELEKTROOPTISCHEN MODULATORS DES MACH-ZEHNDER-TYPS | [2007/19] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING CHIRP OF A MACH-ZEHNDER TYPE ELECTRO-OPTICAL MODULATOR | [2007/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DU "CHIRP" D'UN MODULATEUR ELECTRO-OPTIQUE DU TYPE MACH-ZEHNDER | [2005/09] |
Former [2005/09] | EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES CHIRPENS EINES ELEKTROOPTISCHEN MODULATORS DES MACH-ZENDER-TYPS | ||
Former [2005/09] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING CHIRP OF A MACH-ZENDER TYPE ELECTRO-OPTICAL MODULATOR | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 16.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/12] | 02.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]FR2774762 (FRANCE TELECOM) [DA] 1,7 * page 20, line 19 - page 22, line 16; figure 9 *; | [A]WO0052855 (SIEMENS AG ;PROEBSTER WALTER (DE); WUENSCHE ULLRICH (DE)) [A] 1,7 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0884627 (THOMAS & BETTS INT) [A] 1,7 * claim 1 * |