EP1540428 - REDUNDANT CONTROL UNIT ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/16] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARMBRUSTER, Michael Uferstrasse 10 75203 Königstein-Stein / DE | 02 /
HEILMANN, Harro Helene-Lange-Strasse 40 73760 Ostfildern / DE | 03 /
MAISCH, Ansgar Zehntstrasse 12 76275 Ettlingen / DE | 04 /
ROOKS, Oliver Kopenhagener Str. 10 71034 Böblingen / DE | 05 /
SCHWARZHAUPT, Andreas Lindenbergstr. 30 76829 Landau / DE | 06 /
SPIEGELBERG, Gernot Blossenbergstrasse 44 71296 Heimsheim / DE | 07 /
SULZMANN, Armin Plankstadter Strasse 18 68723 Oftersheim / DE | [2006/22] |
Former [2005/24] | 01 /
ARMBRUSTER, Michael Uferstrasse 10 75203 Königstein-Stein / DE | ||
02 /
HEILMANN, Harro Helene-Lange-Strasse 40 73760 Ostfildern / DE | |||
03 /
MAISCH, Ansgar Zehntstrasse 12 76275 Ettlingen / DE | |||
04 /
ROOKS, Oliver Nelkenstrasse 3 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
05 /
SCHWARZHAUPT, Andreas Klingwiesenstrasse 24 74420 Oberrot / DE | |||
06 /
SPIEGELBERG, Gernot Blossenbergstrasse 44 71296 Heimsheim / DE | |||
07 /
SULZMANN, Armin Plankstadter Strasse 18 68723 Oftersheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03747947.4 | 30.08.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003EP09642 | Priority number, date | DE2002143713 | 20.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10243713 | [2005/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004029737 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1540428 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1540428 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G05B9/03 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G06F11/181 (EP,US);
G05B9/03 (EP,US);
G06F11/2028 (EP,US);
G06F11/2038 (EP,US);
B60T2270/404 (EP,US);
B60T2270/413 (EP,US);
B60T2270/82 (EP,US);
G06F11/1633 (EP,US);
G06F11/182 (EP,US);
G06F11/2048 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/02] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | REDUNDANTE STEUERGERÄTEANORDNUNG | [2005/24] | English: | REDUNDANT CONTROL UNIT ARRANGEMENT | [2005/24] | French: | SYSTEME DE DISPOSITIFS DE COMMANDE REDONDANT | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2004 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 28.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.10.2006 | IT | 04.10.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | IT | 04.10.2006 | |
FR | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | IT | 04.10.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0573106 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1,10 * column 6, line 48 - column 9, line 9 *; | [A]WO9325945 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1,10 * page 9, line 9 - page 10, line 10 *; | [DA]US5515282 (JACKSON DOUGLAS O [US]) [DA] 1,10 * column 5, line 58 - column 10, line 39 *; | [A]DE19612423 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 11 - line 51 *; | [DA]DE19631309 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]); | [A]DE19915253 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 37 *; | [A]DE10002519 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 10 *; | [A]WO02055356 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [A] * page 30, line 6 - page 32, line 10 * |