EP1535463 - METHOD AND SENSOR FOR DETERMINING THE LOCAL CONTRAST OF AN OBSERVED SCENE BY DETECTION OF THE LUMINANCE FROM SAID SCENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSEM Centre Suisse d'Electronique et de Microtechnique SA - Recherche et Développement Rue Jaquet-Droz 1 2007 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states CSEM Centre Suisse d'Electronique et de Microtechnique S.A. - Recherche et Développement rue Jaquet-Droz 1 2007 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states CSEM Centre Suisse d'Electronique et de Microtechnique S.A. - Recherche et Développement rue Jaquet-Droz 1 2007 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIM, Pascal Ch. des Sagnes 13 CH-2022 BEVAIX / CH | 02 /
RUEDI, Pierre, François Ch. du Lac 7 CH-2068 HAUTERIVE / CH | 03 /
FRAGNIERE, Eric Evole 31 CH-2000 NEUCHATEL / CH | 04 /
GRENET, Eric Belleroche 16 CH-2000 NEUCHATEL / CH | 05 /
KAESS, François Au Moulin 13 CH-1312 ECLEPENS / CH | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Colas, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Colas, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet JP COLAS 58 rue de Châteaudun 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/22] | Poidatz, Emmanuel Cabinet JP Colas 37, avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03747952.4 | 01.09.2003 | [2005/22] | WO2003EP09740 | Priority number, date | FR20020010897 | 03.09.2002 Original published format: FR 0210897 | [2005/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004023791 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1535463 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1535463 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/355, H04N5/235, H04N5/3745 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
H04N25/76 (EP);
H04N3/155 (US);
H04N25/46 (EP);
H04N25/708 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/22] | H04N3/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SENSOR ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES LOKALEN KONTRASTES EINER BEOBACHTETEN SZENE DURCH DETEKTION DER VON DIESER SZENE ABGESTRAHLTEN LUMINANZ | [2005/22] | English: | METHOD AND SENSOR FOR DETERMINING THE LOCAL CONTRAST OF AN OBSERVED SCENE BY DETECTION OF THE LUMINANCE FROM SAID SCENE | [2005/22] | French: | PROCEDE ET CAPTEUR POUR DETERMINER LE CONTRASTE LOCAL D'UNE SCENE OBSERVEE, PAR DETECTION DE LA LUMINANCE EMANANT DE CETTE SCENE | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 13.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.02.2011 | CY | 16.02.2011 | CZ | 16.02.2011 | DK | 16.02.2011 | EE | 16.02.2011 | FI | 16.02.2011 | HU | 16.02.2011 | IE | 16.02.2011 | IT | 16.02.2011 | NL | 16.02.2011 | RO | 16.02.2011 | SE | 16.02.2011 | SI | 16.02.2011 | SK | 16.02.2011 | TR | 16.02.2011 | BG | 16.05.2011 | GR | 17.05.2011 | ES | 27.05.2011 | PT | 16.06.2011 | LU | 01.09.2011 | BE | 30.09.2011 | FR | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
TR | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
LU | 01.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
LU | 01.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
FR | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IT | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 16.02.2011 | |
CY | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
NL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SE | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 16.02.2011 | |
GR | 17.05.2011 | ||
ES | 27.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9814002 (BOEHM MARKUS [DE], et al); | [A]US5837993 (PHILIPPE VENIER [CH], et al); | [X]US6069377 (PRENTICE WAYNE E [US], et al); | [A]WO0199292 (DIGIMARC CORP [US], et al) | by applicant | FR2605475 | WO9814002 | EP1150250 |