EP1557367 - LIFTING DEVICE FORMING STRUCTURE AND CHEMICAL CONTAINER HAVING THE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL FACTORY, INC. 115, Aza Kuguhara Tateiwa, Muya-cho Naruto-shi, Tokushima 772-8601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL FACTORY, INC. 115, Aza Kuguhara Tateiwa, Muya-cho Naruto-shi, Tokushima 772-8601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONDA, Hiroshi 4-10, Sako 4 ban-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 770-0024 / JP | 02 /
OKA, Minoru 27-4, Aza Matsudo, Ejiri, Kitajima-cho Itano-gun, Tokushima 771-0205 / JP | 03 /
SHOJI, Hidekatsu 1-10, Aza Nibu, Shinkirai, Kitajima-cho Itano-gun, Tokushima 771-0207 / JP | 04 /
YAMAGUCHI, Shiro 86-1, Aza Fuyozanka, Mitsuishi, Naruto-cho Naruto-shi, Tokushima 772-0052 / JP | 05 /
SHIMOMURA, Hiroyuki 10-37, Akaishi-cho Komatsushima-shi, Tokushima 773-0021 / JP | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse, et al Lepeudry et Associés 43 Rue de la Brèche aux Loups 75012 Paris / FR | [2009/30] |
Former [2008/07] | Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse, et al Lepeudry et Associés 43, rue de la Brèche aux Loups 75012 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/30] | Lhuillier, René, et al Cabinet Lepeudry, 43, rue de la Brèche-aux-Loups 75012 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03748576.0 | 25.09.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003JP12200 | Priority number, date | JP20020294589 | 08.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002294589 | JP20030106169 | 10.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003106169 | [2005/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004033330 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1557367 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D25/22 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
A61J1/2089 (EP,US);
B65D25/20 (KR);
B65D23/005 (EP,US);
B65D25/22 (EP,KR,US);
B65D25/2873 (EP,US);
B65D51/28 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Title | German: | FORMSTRUKTUR FÜR HEBEVORRICHTUNG UND CHEMIKALIENBEHALTER MIT DIESER STRUKTUR | [2005/30] | English: | LIFTING DEVICE FORMING STRUCTURE AND CHEMICAL CONTAINER HAVING THE STRUCTURE | [2005/30] | French: | STRUCTURE FORMANT UN DISPOSITIF DE LEVAGE, ET CONTENANT POUR PRODUITS CHIMIQUES DOTE DE LADITE STRUCTURE | [2005/30] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2005 | Translation filed | 03.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 03.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 01.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/40] | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/40] | Request for further processing for: | 16.03.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 16.03.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.04.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH06269311 ; | [XY]DE2817250 (HENKEL KGAA) [X] 1-9 * page 2, paragraph 1; figure 1; claim 1 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph L * [Y] 10-13; | [Y]EP0843992 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [Y] 10-13 * abstract * * column 8, line 6 - column 12, line 47 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941220), vol. 018, no. 678, Database accession no. (C - 1290), & JP06269311 A 19940927 (SUUPAA PLANNING:KK) [AD] 1-13 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS5521967U ; | [Y]JPS57101739U ; | [Y]JPH0586836U ; | [Y]JPH0711545U ; | [Y]JPH08126683 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO, et al); | [Y]JPH11157547 (KAO CORP); | [Y]JP2000070341 (OTSUKA PHARMA FACTORY INC) |