EP1460651 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING R-T-B BASED RARE EARTH ELEMENT PERMANENT MAGNET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2007/08] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIZAKA, Chikara, c/o TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | 02 /
NISHIZAWA, Gouichi, c/o TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | 03 /
HIDAKA, Tetsuya, c/o TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | 04 /
FUKUNO, Akira, c/o TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | 05 /
UCHIDA, Nobuya, c/o TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03748613.1 | 30.09.2003 | [2004/39] | WO2003JP12492 | Priority number, date | JP20020287033 | 30.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002287033 | JP20030092890 | 28.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003092890 | [2004/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004030000 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1460651 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1460651 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/04, C22C33/02, H01F1/057, H01F1/053, H01F1/047 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
C22C38/005 (EP);
C22C33/0228 (EP);
C22C33/0278 (EP);
C22C38/06 (EP);
C22C38/14 (EP);
H01F1/0557 (EP);
H01F1/0577 (EP);
H01F41/0253 (EP);
B22F2998/10 (EP);
C22C2202/02 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F9/023, B22F9/04, B22F3/02, B22F3/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/39] | H01F1/08, H01F1/04, C22C33/02, C22C38/00, C22C38/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SELTENERDELEMENT-PERMANENTMAGNETEN AUF R-T-B-BASIS | [2004/39] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING R-T-B BASED RARE EARTH ELEMENT PERMANENT MAGNET | [2004/39] | French: | METHODE DE PRODUCTION D'UN AIMANT PERMANENT A ELEMENTS DES TERRES RARES EN ALLIAGE DE R-T-B | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2004 | Translation filed | 21.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 23.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1041113 ; | [A]JPH10259459 ; | [A]EP0302395 (TDK CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * figures 1-5; examples 1,6,8 *; | [A]EP0753867 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * claim 8 *; | [A]EP0994493 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6* paragraphs [0031] - [0037] *; | [A]EP1014392 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * example 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP1033415 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] *; | [X]EP1164599 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0039] , [0040] , [0074] , [0075]; figures 1-4; example 3; claim 4 *; | [A] - KIM A S ET AL, "MICROSTRUCTURE OF ZR CONTAINING NDFEB", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199709), vol. 33, no. 5, PART 2, ISSN 0018-9464, pages 3823 - 3825, XP000703229 [A] 1-6 * figures 2-4; table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.619583 | [A] - POLLARD R J ET AL, "EFFECT OF ZR ADDITIONS ON THE MICROSTRUCTURAL AND MAGNETIC PROPERTIES OF NDFEB BASED MAGNETS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19880301), vol. 24, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9464, pages 1626 - 1628, XP000174162 [A] 1-6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.11551 | [A] - BESENICAR S, "THE INFLUENCE OF ZRO2 ADDITION ON THE MICROSTRUCTURE AND THE MAGNETIC PROPERTIES OF ND-DY-FE-B MAGNETS", JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19920201), vol. 104 - 107, no. PART 2, ISSN 0304-8853, pages 1175 - 1178, XP000329968 [A] 1-6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-8853(92)90539-Z | [A] - MCGUINESS P J ET AL, "Magnetic properties and microstructure in NdDyFeBZr-HDDR", JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980915), vol. 188, no. 1-2, ISSN 0304-8853, pages 119 - 124, XP004141643 [A] 1-6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-8853(98)00168-1 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10041113 A 19980213 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10259459 A 19980929 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH01196104 (TDK CORP); | [A]JPH07130522 (TDK CORP); | [X]JPH07176414 (TDK CORP); | [A]JPH09223617 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [Y]JPH1064712 (HITACHI METALS LTD); | [A]WO0012771 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al); | [A]JP2002075717 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JP2002093610 (AICHI STEEL WORKS LTD); | [Y]JP2002164239 (HITACHI METALS LTD) |