EP1599652 - LIMIT CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anzon Autodoor Limited Customhouse, Level 9, 50 Anzac Avenue Auckland / NZ | [2005/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEIB, Michael, Kevin 118 Ngaphui Road Remuera, AUCKLAND / NZ | 02 /
JONES, Andrew 28 Naylor Street Hamilton / NZ | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Alexander, Thomas Bruce, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam gardens 70, Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | Alexander, Thomas Bruce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03748812.9 | 16.09.2003 | [2005/48] | WO2003NZ00212 | Priority number, date | NZ20020522578 | 12.11.2002 Original published format: NZ 52257802 | [2005/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004044362 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1599652 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/10, E06B9/68 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
E06B9/68 (EP,US);
E05F15/40 (EP,US);
E05F15/681 (EP,US);
F16H35/00 (EP,US);
H01H19/18 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/726 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/00 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/106 (EP,US);
F16H2035/006 (EP,US);
H01H3/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANSCHLAGSTEUERUNG | [2005/48] | English: | LIMIT CONTROL | [2005/48] | French: | COMMANDE DE LIMITATION | [2005/48] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 10.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 31.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 14.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2008 | 30.09.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5243784 (WHITAKER LOUIS G [US], et al); | [A]US5181891 (POHL PETER [DE], et al); | [A]US6167770 (NASS ULRICH [DE]); | [A]US4159598 (GATLAND GEOFFREY H, et al) |