EP1560924 - MOLECULAR LYMPHATIC MAPPING OF SENTINEL LYMPH NODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states John Wayne Cancer Institute 2200 Santa Monica Boulevard Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US | [2005/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOON, David, S., B. 1911 Malcom Avenue 301 Los Angeles, CA 90404 / US | 02 /
TABACK, Bret 1431 Ocean Avenue 507 Santa Monica, CA90401 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2005/32] | 01 /
HOON, David, S., B. 1911 Malcom Avenue #301 Los Angeles, CA 90404 / US | ||
02 /
TABACK, Bret 1431 Ocean Avenue 507 Santa Monica, CA90401 / US | Representative(s) | Dehmel, Albrecht Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte PartmbB Herzogspitalstrasse 11 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Dehmel, Albrecht Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte Herzogspitalstrasse 11 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/32] | Dehmel, Albrecht, Dr. Herzogspitalstrasse 11 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03749055.4 | 15.08.2003 | [2005/32] | WO2003US25553 | Priority number, date | US20020403872P | 16.08.2002 Original published format: US 403872 P | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004016154 | Date: | 26.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1560924 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
A61K49/006 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/112 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOLEKULARE LYMPHATISCHE KARTIERUNG VON VIRCHOW-LYMPHKNOTEN | [2005/32] | English: | MOLECULAR LYMPHATIC MAPPING OF SENTINEL LYMPH NODES | [2005/32] | French: | MAPPAGE LYMPHATIQUE MOLECULAIRE DE GANGLIONS LYMPHATIQUES SENTINELLES | [2005/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 13.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/03] | 30.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.04.2005 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | 25.04.2005 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.04.2005 | M01   Fee paid on   30.05.2005 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - BOSTICK PETER J ET AL, "Detection of metastases in sentinel lymph nodes of breast cancer patients by multiple-marker RT-PCR", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, (19981218), vol. 79, no. 6, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 645 - 651, XP002370891 [Y] 1-10 * see the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0215(19981218)79:6<645::AID-IJC16>3.0.CO;2-R | [Y] - NOGUCHI S ET AL, "DETECTION OF BREAST CANCER MICROMETASTASES IN AXILLARY LYMPH NODES BY MEANS OF REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE-POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1996), vol. 148, no. 2, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 649 - 656, XP002915053 [Y] 1-10 * see the whole document * | [Y] - GHOSSEIN R A ET AL, "Molecular detection of micrometastases and circulating tumor cells in solid tumors", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (199908), vol. 5, no. 8, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 1950 - 1960, XP002225510 [Y] 1-10 * see the whole document * | [Y] - BOSTICK PETER J ET AL, "Prognostic significance of occult metastases detected by sentinel lymphadenectomy and reverse transcriptase-polymerase chain reaction in early-stage melanoma patients", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (199910), vol. 17, no. 10, ISSN 0732-183X, pages 3238 - 3244, XP002370892 [Y] 1-10 * see the whole document * | [Y] - BIELIGK S C ET AL, "Detection of tyrosinase mRNA by reverse transcription-polymerase chain reaction in melanoma sentinel nodes.", ANNALS OF SURGICAL ONCOLOGY : THE OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY OF SURGICAL ONCOLOGY. 1999 APR-MAY, (199904), vol. 6, no. 3, ISSN 1068-9265, pages 232 - 240, XP002370893 [Y] 1-10 * see the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10434-999-0232-z | [PX] - TABACK BRET ET AL, "Molecular lymphatic mapping of the sentinel lymph node", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (200210), vol. 161, no. 4, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 1153 - 1161, XP002370894 [PX] 1-10 * see the whole document * | International search | [X]US6057105 (HOON DAVE S B [US], et al); | [A]US6583336 (REISS BERND [DE], et al) |