EP1530620 - ADDITIVES TO ENHANCE METAL AND AMINE REMOVAL IN REFINERY DESALTING PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baker Hughes Incorporated 2929 Allen Parkway Suite 2100 Houston, TX 77019 / US | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED 2929 Allen Parkway, Suite 2100 Houston, TX 77019-2118 / US | ||
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states Baker Hughes Incorporated 2929 Allen Parkway Suite 2100 Houston TX 77019 / US | ||
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states Backer Hugues Incorporated 2929 Allen Parkway Suite 2100 Houston TX 77019 / US | ||
Former [2005/20] | For all designated states BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED 3900 Essex Lane Suite 1200 Houston, Texas 77027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN, Tran, M. 5615 Forest Trail Drive Houston, TX 77084 / US | 02 /
KREMER, Lawrence, N. 6 Greenridge Forest Drive The Woodlands, TX 77381 / US | 03 /
WEERS, Jerry, J. 3106 Saddle Ridge Court Richmond, TX 77469 / US | [2005/20] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Beacham, Annabel Rose Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/20] | Beacham, Annabel Rose Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03749221.2 | 28.08.2003 | [2005/20] | WO2003US27116 | Priority number, date | US20020407139P | 30.08.2002 Original published format: US 407139 P | US20030649921P | 27.08.2003 Original published format: US 649921 P | [2005/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004020553 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1530620 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1530620 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C10G17/04, C10G31/08 | [2005/20] | CPC: |
C10G17/04 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B01D17/0217 (EP,US);
B01D17/047 (EP,US);
C10G31/08 (EP,GB,KR,US);
C10G33/02 (EP,US);
C10G33/04 (EP,US);
C10G2300/202 (EP,US);
C10G2300/205 (EP,US);
C10G2300/44 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01D17/0217, B01D17/047 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/14] |
Former [2005/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ADDITIVE ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER METALL- UND AMINE-ENTFERNUNG IN DEN RAFFINERIE-ENTSALZUNGSVERFAHREN | [2005/20] | English: | ADDITIVES TO ENHANCE METAL AND AMINE REMOVAL IN REFINERY DESALTING PROCESSES | [2005/20] | French: | ADDITIFS PERMETTANT D'ACCROITRE L'ELIMINATION DE METAUX ET AMINES DANS DES PROCESSUS DE RAFFINAGE-DESSALEMENT | [2005/20] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/20] | 19.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.12.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10010806.7 / EP2287272 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2005 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 09.05.2012 | EE | 09.05.2012 | TR | 09.05.2012 | BG | 09.08.2012 | CY | 28.08.2012 | CZ | 28.08.2012 | IE | 28.08.2012 | IT | 28.08.2012 | LU | 28.08.2012 | BE | 31.08.2012 | CH | 31.08.2012 | LI | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2020/36] |
Former [2014/27] | DK | 09.05.2012 | |
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
TR | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
CY | 28.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2012 | ||
IE | 28.08.2012 | ||
IT | 28.08.2012 | ||
LU | 28.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | DK | 09.05.2012 | |
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
TR | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
CY | 28.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2012 | ||
IE | 28.08.2012 | ||
IT | 28.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/08] | DK | 09.05.2012 | |
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
CY | 28.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2012 | ||
IE | 28.08.2012 | ||
IT | 28.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/07] | DK | 09.05.2012 | |
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
CY | 28.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2012 | ||
FI | 28.08.2012 | ||
IE | 28.08.2012 | ||
IT | 28.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | DK | 09.05.2012 | |
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
CY | 28.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2012 | ||
FI | 28.08.2012 | ||
IE | 28.08.2012 | ||
IT | 28.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 09.05.2012 | |
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
CY | 28.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2012 | ||
FI | 28.08.2012 | ||
IE | 28.08.2012 | ||
IT | 28.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | DK | 09.05.2012 | |
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 28.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2012 | ||
FI | 28.08.2012 | ||
IE | 28.08.2012 | ||
IT | 28.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/27] | DK | 09.05.2012 | |
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 28.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2012 | ||
FI | 28.08.2012 | ||
IT | 28.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | DK | 09.05.2012 | |
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 28.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2012 | ||
FI | 28.08.2012 | ||
IT | 28.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | DK | 09.05.2012 | |
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2012 | ||
FI | 28.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | DK | 09.05.2012 | |
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | DK | 09.05.2012 | |
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | DK | 09.05.2012 | |
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | DK | 09.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4778590 (REYNOLDS JOHN G [US], et al); | [X]US4778589 (REYNOLDS JOHN G [US]); | [X]US4778592 (REYNOLDS JOHN G [US]); | [X]US4853109 (REYNOLDS JOHN G [US]); | [X]US4988433 (REYNOLDS JOHN G [US], et al); | [X]US5080779 (AWBREY SPENCER S [US], et al); | [A]WO0052114 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US], et al) |